Case: 97-0181
97-0181
03/04/1997
Extension to file App Writ Err Under Rule 130d
FRANK JOHN STANGEL
JANICE HOLLUMS PARKER and SARA LEE CORPORATION d/b/a MARYLAND-SARA LEE CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/25/1997 | Case Stored | | | |
09/19/1997 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | to COA; mandate issued 08/19/97 | | |
06/12/1997 | Second M/E/T to file App Writ Err disposed of. | Overruled | 945 SW2d 114 | |
04/28/1997 | Second M/E/T to file App Writ Err Filed. | | | |
04/23/1997 | Call received | will be filing an additional 130(d) motion | | |
03/21/1997 | Extension of time to file app writ err disposed of | Filing granted | Motion to extend time to file mo/re in CA is granted; pet. has fifteen days from this date to file mo/re at CA | |
03/21/1997 | Order of the Court Issued | Petitioner has fifteen days from date of this order to file mo/re in court of appeals- Monday April 7th | | |
03/21/1997 | Per Curiam Opinion | Per curiam on granting of 130(d) motion; pursuant to TRAP 100(g), petitioner is granted relief from CA. | | |
03/11/1997 | Call received | from Flea at COA - Mandate was issue 02-27-97 | | |
03/04/1997 | Extension of time to file app writ err filed | | | |
03/04/1997 | Notice requesting filing fee | $50 filing fee from Frank John Stangel | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
09/25/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 28B1 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STANGEL, FRANK JOHN | Petitioner | Mr. Frank John Stangel |
SARAH LEE CORPORATION | Respondent | Mr. Timothy King Fifer |
PARKER, JANICE HOLLUMS | Respondent | Mr. R. Lynn Fielder Mr. Timothy King Fifer |
MARYLAND-SARAH LEE CORPORATION | Respondent | Mr. Timothy King Fifer |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-95-00210-CV
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information