judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PHALON, JOSEPH DC RENTAL HOUSING COMMISSION

Case Information: 82-AA-1276
Short Caption:PHALON, JOSEPH DC RENTAL HOUSING COMMISSIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Rental Housing Commission
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:10/14/1982

Opening Event Date:10/14/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/02/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/22/1983
Argued/Submitted:11/30/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-RespondentJohn Doe N
Jeffry A. Kappstatter NN
Intervenor-RespondentJohn Doe N
Paul D. Crumrine NN
PetitionerJohn Doe N
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Karen J. Krueger NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PHALON, JOSEPH ET AL DC RENTAL HOUSING COMMISSION
01/01/1906 KAPPSTATTERJ FOR EDWARD EMES
10/14/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/02/1983FiledRecord Completed
08/22/1983FiledBriefing Completed
11/30/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/20/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition