Case: 05-89-00662-CV
05-89-00662-CV
06/05/1989
Divorce
Gillispie, Douglas Cragg
Deloris Diane Gillispie
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/27/2001 | Order entered | Destroy | |
06/18/2001 | Order entered | Destroy | |
06/18/2001 | Order Entered | Destroy | |
04/18/2001 | Record Pickup | | |
10/23/1997 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
06/21/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/21/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/25/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/25/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/11/1990 | Submission | | |
04/11/1990 | Submitted | | |
04/11/1990 | Submission | | |
04/11/1990 | Submitted | | |
02/23/1990 | MattConv | | |
11/15/1989 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
11/15/1989 | Supplemental Transcript filed | | |
10/25/1989 | Mot Ext Time File Strans Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/09/1989 | Mot Ext Time File Strans | | |
09/25/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
09/25/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/25/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/15/1989 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/13/1989 | Response to Motion | | |
09/07/1989 | Letter Filed | | |
09/07/1989 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
09/06/1989 | Mot Ext Time Sup Sfacts Disp | Motion or Writ Denied | |
09/06/1989 | Mot Ext Time File Strans Disp | Motion or Writ Denied | |
09/05/1989 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
08/22/1989 | Mot Ext Time File Strans | | |
08/22/1989 | Mot Ext Time File Sup Sfacts | | |
08/15/1989 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/15/1989 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
08/14/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
08/14/1989 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
06/29/1989 | Response to Motion | | |
06/20/1989 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
06/20/1989 | MattConv | | |
06/05/1989 | Transcript Filed | | |
06/05/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
04/28/1989 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
04/06/1989 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/18/2001 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
294th Judicial District Court
Van Zandt
Honorable Tommy W. Wallace
86-250