Case: AP-72,794
AP-72,794
06/16/1997
Appeal Case Type
RENFRO, STEVEN CEON
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/21/1997 | BRIEF WAIVED | State | |
08/11/1997 | BRIEF FILED | Pro Se | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/02/2001 | ARCHIVED | | |
02/17/1998 | WARRANT RECEIVED | | |
02/09/1998 | EXECUTED | | |
11/12/1997 | EXECUTION DATE SET | | |
10/10/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process | | |
10/10/1997 | MANDATE ISSD | | |
09/24/1997 | OPINION ISSD | Affirmed | |
09/24/1997 | OPINION ISSD | Affirmed | |
08/21/1997 | BRIEF WAIVED | | |
08/11/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process | | |
08/11/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process | | |
08/11/1997 | BRIEF FILED | | |
08/11/1997 | SET FOR SUBMIS | | |
08/11/1997 | SF FILED DP | | |
08/11/1997 | SUBMITTED | | |
07/02/1997 | ORDER FILED | | |
06/23/1997 | TRANSCRIPT FILED | | |
06/16/1997 | DP BEGIN | | |
06/16/1997 | DP BEGIN | | |
06/16/1997 | EXT SF DISP | Granted | |
06/16/1997 | EXT SF FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/02/2001 | STORED | ARCHIVED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Richard Berry, Jr. |
RENFRO, STEVEN CEON | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | George Valton Jones |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
71st District Court
Harrison
Honorable BONNIE LEGGAT
96-0102