judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00538-CR
01-89-00538-CR
06/02/1989
Other Drug Sale
McKinney, Wade Edwin
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/11/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/11/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/10/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
10/26/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
10/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/25/1990Submitted
09/25/1990Submission
09/25/1990Submitted
07/25/1990Submission
05/10/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
05/10/1990Case ready to be set
05/10/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/10/1990Case ready to be set
04/30/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/26/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/19/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/23/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
02/22/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/12/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/11/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/27/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/30/1989Statement of facts filed
11/28/1989Statement of facts filed
10/05/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
09/21/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
09/21/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/11/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/05/1989Brief due for retained counsel
07/28/1989Transcript filed
06/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/31/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
05/31/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/11/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - AppellantLana Gordon
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
Honorable ROBERT N. BURDETTE
488920
25 years TDC & 1,000 fine