Case: 07-99-00458-CV
07-99-00458-CV
11/12/1999
Miscellaneous civil
McAlister Television Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a KAMC-TV Channel 28; Gregory F. McAlister, an individual and James Clark, an individual
Bobby Frank Blue
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/02/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/09/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
12/05/2000 | Submitted | | |
11/10/2000 | Submission | | |
09/18/2000 | Motion Requesting Oral Argument Disposed | GRANT | |
09/18/2000 | Motion to Vacate, i.e. Oral Submission, Stay or Order | GRANT | |
09/15/2000 | Motion Requesting Oral Argument Filed | | |
09/15/2000 | Motion to Vacate, i.e. Oral Submission, Stay or Order | | |
09/08/2000 | Submission | | |
04/04/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/04/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
03/14/2000 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
03/10/2000 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
02/15/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
01/26/2000 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | GRANT | |
12/23/1999 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
11/12/1999 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
11/12/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
11/12/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/02/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mcalister Television Enterpris | Appellant | R. Byrn Bass Jr. |
Blue, Bobby Frank | Appellee | Steve White |
Trial Court Information
99th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Mackey K. Hancock
97-560,705