Case Information: 38653 | |||
Short Caption: | SCOTT (DAVID) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR98P1516B | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/21/2002 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/19/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
10/19/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-17709 | |
10/23/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. | 01-17869 | |
10/24/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-17880 | |
12/31/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of this order, file and serve the transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. | 01-21883 | |
01/03/2002 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 02-00173 | |
01/23/2002 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 01/23/02 (Reno/Carson). | 02-01585 | |
01/23/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 02-01589 | |
02/25/2002 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 02/25/02 (Reno/Carson). Signed by: Gary H. Hatlestad. | 02-03512 | |
03/21/2002 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 03/21/02. Signed by: Richard F. Cornell. | 02-05029 | |
03/21/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/10/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02M-WM/DA/ML | 02-06355 | |
05/07/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-06533 | |
05/07/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/20/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 15, 2002. | 02-06533 |