Case: PD-0796-89
PD-0796-89
06/05/1989
PDR Case Type
SMITH, JAMES HAYDEN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/16/1990 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
02/28/1990 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
07/06/1989 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
06/05/1989 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/26/1990 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
SMITH, JAMES HAYDEN | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | John H. Hagler |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John C. Vance |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-86-00632-CR
Aff 4-26-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
292nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable MICHAEL KEASLER
F86-96991-SV