Case: A-9914
A-9914
12/18/1963
Application for Writ of Error
TOM E. TURNER
INTERSTATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/09/1964 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | | |
04/06/1964 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
04/03/1964 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
03/09/1964 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
02/27/1964 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
01/22/1964 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
01/06/1964 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
12/18/1963 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/09/1964 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
04/06/1964 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
04/03/1964 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
03/31/1964 | Miscellaneous letter | | ||
03/09/1964 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
03/09/1964 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/27/1964 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/22/1964 | Reply to Response | | ||
01/06/1964 | Response to Petition | | ||
12/18/1963 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
12/18/1963 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Interstate Life Insurance Company | Respondent | |
Tom E. Turner | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information