Case Information: 35545 | |||
Short Caption: | STEWART (LEWIS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 37169 , 39020 , 48275 , 49360 , 53215 , 70052 , 70052-COA , 70544 , 70544-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C159309 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/11/2000 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/27/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/27/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 00-01350 | |
01/28/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 06/15/99; 07/29/99; 08/12/99; 09/07/99; 11/02/99; 11/04/99; 11/08/99; 11/09/99; 12/21/99; and 12/22/99 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Robert Mintun. | 00-01471 | |
02/01/2000 | Other | Other. Upon further review, it has been determined that this is not a fast track appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). | ||
02/10/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 00-02112 | |
03/15/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 06/15/99; 07/29/99; 08/12/99; 09/07/99; 11/02/99; 11/04/99; 12/21/99; 12/22/99; 11/08/99 & 11/09/99; and 11/09/99 Court Reporter: Robert Mintun. | 00-04102 | |
05/15/2000 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 5/12/00. | 00-08022 | |
06/16/2000 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: Las Vegas Drop Box 6/14/00. | 00-10261 | |
06/16/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 00-10262 | |
07/14/2000 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 7/13/00. | 00-12162 | |
12/11/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for dicision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 00-21550 | |
12/11/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | ||
12/18/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's order." SNP00A-1-RR/CY/NB. | 00-22008 | |
01/12/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-22082 | |
01/12/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/27/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 19, 2001. | 00-22082 |