judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

YOUNG, THOMAS UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CM-1373
Short Caption:YOUNG, THOMAS UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Unlawful Entry
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:10/04/1982

Opening Event Date:10/04/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/12/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/14/1983
Argued/Submitted:03/07/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Ted Kavrukov NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Thomas E. Zeno YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901YOUNG, THOMAS UNITED STATES
10/04/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/12/1983FiledRecord Completed
12/14/1983FiledBriefing Completed
03/07/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/22/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition