judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

U.S. DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION VS. I.B.E.W. LOCAL 357

Case Information: 37161
Short Caption:U.S. DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION VS. I.B.E.W. LOCAL 357Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A399701Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Senior Justice YoungPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/26/2000 / Hale, FloydSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/12/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/18/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Marquis & Aurbach--check no. 53604.
12/18/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. 00-22014
12/26/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Floyd A. Hale. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/22/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-05085
03/22/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
04/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-05961
04/09/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-06134
04/09/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Re: The filing of docketing statement not on proper form.
04/23/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/7/00 and 10/23/00. To Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. 01-06820
05/16/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Supplemental Request for Transcript of the Proceedings. Transcripts requested: August 22, 2000. To Court Reporter: Cat Nelson. 01-08160
05/18/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/7/00, 10/23/00. Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. 01-08324
06/04/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 12, 2000. To Court Reporter: Cat Nelson. 01-09219
06/04/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 12, 2000. Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. 01-09305
07/09/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (Amended). Appellant is no longer requesting the 8/22/00 transcript as it was prepared prior to the appeal being filed and will be included in the appendix. 01-11542
08/07/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 08/03/01. 01-13292
08/07/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 4. 01-13293
08/13/2001MotionFiled Motion. Rule 27(c) Motion for Procedural Order Granting Leave to File Separate Appendix; and Request that Order Granting Leave be Entered pursuant to Rule 27(b) without awaiting a Response Hereto; and Motion to Strike Appellant's Appendix. 01-13695
08/14/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata To: Rule 27(c) Motion for Procedural Order Granting Leave to File Separate Appendix; and Request that Order Granting Leave be Entered pursuant to Rule 27(b) without awaiting a Response Hereto; and Motion to Strike Appellant's Appendix. 01-13789
08/21/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to IBEW Local 357 Joint Trust Funds Rule 27(c) Motion for Procedural Order Granting Leave to File Separate Appendix; and Request that Order Granting Leave be entered pursuant to Rule 27(b) without awaiting a response hereto; and Motion to Strike Appellant's Appendix. 01-14148
09/04/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Union's Answering Brief (International Brotherhood). Mailed on: 08/30/01. 01-14896
09/05/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent I.B.E.W. Local 357 Joint Trust Fund's Answering Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 08/31/01. 01-14977
09/05/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent I.B.E.W. Local 357 Joint Trust Funds' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 through 4. 01-14978
09/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On August 13, 2001, respondent I.B.E.W. Local 357 Joint Trust Funds filed a motion entitled, 'Rule 27(c) Motion for Procedural Order Granting Leave to File Separate Appendix; and Request That Order Granting Leave Be Entered Pursuant to Rule 27(b) Without Awaiting a Response Hereto; and Motion to strike Appellant's Appendix.'As appellants filed a timely opposition to the motion prior to our resolution of the motion, we deny as moot Trust Funds' request for an order granting the motion without awaiting response. Additionally, as Trust Funds has filed a comprehensive brief along with its answering brief, we deny as moot the request for permission to file such an appendix. Because in appellant's appendix is properly organized, and because any procedural deficiencies in the appendix do not appear to have been conducted willfully or with gross negligence, we decline to strike appellant's appendix. We remind the parties that this court will ignore any document or notation thereon that is not properly part of the record before this court. 01-15683
10/03/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 10/1/01. 01-16629
01/10/2002OtherDisqualification of Justice Young.
01/25/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Notice of Change of Office Address, Telephone and Fax Numbers (Patricia Waldeck). 02-01751
02/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-02760
02/12/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-WM/DA/ML
07/18/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Maupin, C.J., Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. Per Curiam. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 49. SNP02 02-12287
08/13/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-12812
08/13/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 16, 2002. 02-12812