Case Information: 37151 | |||
Short Caption: | LOBATO (GREG) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR2952 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/14/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/14/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 00-21917 | |
01/12/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 01-00718 | |
01/16/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 01-00840 | |
02/01/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 01-02161 | |
02/01/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 01-02162 | |
02/21/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the amended judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 01-03242 | |
03/13/2001 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. LV drop box 3/12/01. | 01-04489 | |
01/24/2002 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 02-01677 | |
01/31/2002 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Mailed on: 01/29/02. | 02-02090 | |
02/11/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-02018 | |
02/11/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/21/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 13, 2002. | 02-02018 | |
02/22/2002 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC | 02-03388 |