Case Information: 37122 | |||
Short Caption: | REYNOLDS (GARY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR001798B | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/07/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/07/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 00-21380 | |
01/16/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to suplement appellant's proper person motion to dismiss this appeal with an affidavit. We suspend the briefing schedule for this case pending further order of this court. | 01-00925 | |
02/02/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. In Response to Court's Order. | 01-02235 | |
02/12/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Counsel for appellant is still representing appellant for purposes of this appeal, until such time as this court may grant a motion to withdraw. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to supplement appellant's proper person motion to dismiss this appeal with an affidavit indicating that counsel has explained to appellant the legal effects and consequences of a dismissal of the appeal and tha appellant knowingly and voluntarily consents to a dismissal of the appeal. | 01-02748 | |
02/27/2001 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Reply to Court's Order. | 01-03626 | |
03/15/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On February 27, 2001, counsel for appellant filed a response to the February 12, 2001 order, in which she informs this court that appellant wishes to proceed with his appel. Counsel for appellant also requests and extension of time. The motion is granted. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 30 days from the date of this order. | 01-04658 | |
04/13/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 01-06399 | |
04/13/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 01-06400 | |
05/03/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 01-07451 | |
05/30/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED.' NNP01A-MS/DA/RR | 01-08998 | |
06/26/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-09024 | |
06/26/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/05/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 27, 2001. | 01-09024 |