judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARRIGAN, DELIA DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 84-CV-0751
Short Caption:CARRIGAN, DELIA DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 84-CV-0626 Consolidated:84-CV-0751
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA13494-83Filed Date:05/21/1984

Opening Event Date:05/21/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/06/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/14/1984
Argued/Submitted:03/25/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDelia Carrigan NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charlotte Brookins-Hudson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CARRIGAN, DELIA DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
05/21/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/06/1984FiledRecord Completed
12/14/1984FiledBriefing Completed
03/25/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/03/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition