judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

J. E. BROUSSARD, ET AL. v. CITY OF BEAUMONT, L. CARTWRIGHT REALTY COMPANY

Case: A-192
A-192
05/22/1944
Application for Writ of Error
J. E. BROUSSARD, ET AL.
CITY OF BEAUMONT, L. CARTWRIGHT REALTY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/21/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/31/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/26/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/25/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/22/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/22/1944Additional Copies receivedOverruled
06/21/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/31/1944Reply to Response
05/26/1944Response to Petition
05/25/1944Response to Petition
05/24/1944Additional Copies receivedRefused
05/22/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
05/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
L. Cartwright Realty CompanyRespondent
J. E. Broussard, et al.Petitioner
CITY OF BEAUMONTRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information