judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SNAPE VS. TANNER

Case Information: 36189
Short Caption:SNAPE VS. TANNERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36121 , 36152 , 36337 , 37654 , 37671 , 37797 , 37798 , 39343
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A392937Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/26/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
05/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-08978
06/06/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Decision and Order filed 5/16/00. Due Date: 10 days
06/22/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
06/23/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on May 16, 2000. 00-10762
07/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We note that appellant has failed to pay the filing fee mandated by NRS 2.250. This constitutes an independent basis for dismissal of this appeal.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-12052
07/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On July 13, 2000, this appeal was dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. On July 3, 2000, appellant submitted a motion for leave to appear in proper person and a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, for a stay, and to waive procedural rules. In light of the July 13, 2000 order dismissing this appeal, the motions are denied as moot. fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant.] 00-12594
08/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13781
08/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13781