judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MAX ALAN ROESCHLEIN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-182)
Case Number:06-182Case Docketed On:08/09/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:MAX ALAN ROESCHLEIN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MAX ALAN ROESCHLEIN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMax Alan RoeschleinD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 156
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/09/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/09/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/09/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/25/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/25/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/08/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/09/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/27/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/28/2006Order - Grant - third extension of time, no additional requests will be consideredOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
01/29/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
03/14/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/19/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/13/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Presentence Investigation; Volume III, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/23/2007Order - Other - Emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument (Justice Golden ill).OrderOtherFinal
04/24/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Hill, Kite and Burke (Donna D. Domonkos, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/24/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/02/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/18/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/18/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/18/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/23/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/22/07 by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal