judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NICKS, JOSEPH UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0331
Short Caption:NICKS, JOSEPH UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F726-80Filed Date:02/23/1981

Opening Event Date:02/23/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/24/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/30/1983
Argued/Submitted:01/10/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Roger J. Mcclure NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Bertrand Shipley Thomas YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901NICKS, JOSEPH UNITED STATES
02/23/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/24/1981FiledRecord Completed
09/30/1983FiledBriefing Completed
01/10/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/21/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition