judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9905
A-9905
12/16/1963
Application for Writ of Error
GERTRUDE SUE MAINER
AMERICAN HOSPITAL AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, GREAT NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/30/1964Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/31/1964Response to Reply filedRespondent
01/22/1964Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/20/1964Response to PetitionRespondent
01/13/1964Response to PetitionRespondent
12/16/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/08/1964Response to Motion filed
05/06/1964Response to Motion filed
04/30/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/31/1964Response to Reply filed
01/22/1964Reply to Response
01/20/1964Response to Petition
01/13/1964Response to Petition
12/16/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/16/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Great National Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
American Hospital and Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
Gertrude Sue MainerPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information