judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

COLBERT, JESSIE L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CM-1406
Short Caption:COLBERT, JESSIE L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M3995-82Filed Date:10/20/1982

Opening Event Date:10/20/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/28/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/31/1983
Argued/Submitted:09/13/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Leroy Nesbitt YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COLBERT, JESSIE L. UNITED STATES
10/20/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/28/1983FiledRecord Completed
05/31/1983FiledBriefing Completed
09/13/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/23/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition