Case: 14-00-00930-CR
14-00-00930-CR
08/02/2000
Assault & battery
Ray, Rondel
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/07/2003 | Case stored | | |
12/06/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/03/2002 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
12/02/2002 | Record RETURNED from Higher Court | | |
09/11/2002 | Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSED | REFUSED | |
03/21/2002 | Record Sent | | |
02/11/2002 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
02/11/2002 | Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
01/10/2002 | Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STA | OVERRULED | |
11/21/2001 | Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehear.DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
11/21/2001 | Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA | | |
11/19/2001 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
11/15/2001 | Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,APP | | |
11/05/2001 | Motion for rehearing RECEIVED - ANT,APE,PRO SE | | |
11/05/2001 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
11/02/2001 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
10/18/2001 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
10/18/2001 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
10/17/2001 | Submission | | |
10/17/2001 | Submitted | | |
10/04/2001 | Submitted 39.8 | | |
08/31/2001 | Submission letter 39.8 sent this date | | |
11/20/2000 | State's brief DUE | | |
11/10/2000 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
11/10/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/10/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/19/2000 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/19/2000 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
10/13/2000 | Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |
10/13/2000 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/09/2000 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
09/21/2000 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
09/08/2000 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
09/08/2000 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/18/2000 | Docketing statement DUE | | |
08/09/2000 | Reporters record FILED - ANT,APP,STA | | |
08/08/2000 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |
08/08/2000 | Motion to change designation of parties or counsel | | |
08/07/2000 | Record due | | |
08/07/2000 | Reporter's Record Due | | |
08/03/2000 | Clerk's copy of NOA FILED | | |
08/02/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
06/07/2000 | Date of Sentence | | |
06/07/2000 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/06/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Melinda Diane Doell |
RAY, RONDEL | Criminal - Appellant | Joseph L. Lanza |
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 13
Harris
98-28729
60 days/ $2000 fine