judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9902
A-9902
12/13/1963
MISC PETITION
AUSTIN E. STEWART, RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS
HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING COMPANY, TIDEWATER OIL COMPANY AND CITIES SERVICE OIL COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/29/1964Errata Filed
04/23/1964Motion for Rehearing
02/15/1964Post submission brief filed
02/13/1964Post submission brief filed
01/24/1964Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/24/1964Appellees' Brief filed
01/10/1964Appellant's Brief filed
12/17/1963Appellant's Brief filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/07/1964Letter Filed
04/29/1964Errata Filed
04/28/1964Response to Motion filed
04/23/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/08/1964Opinion issued
02/15/1964Post submission brief filed
02/13/1964Post submission brief filed
01/24/1964Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/24/1964Appellees' Brief filed
01/23/1964Document received (See Remarks)
01/10/1964Appellant's Brief filed
12/17/1963Miscellaneous Motion
12/17/1963Appellant's Brief filed
12/13/1963Document received (See Remarks)
12/13/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Humble Oil and Refining Company, Tidewater Oil Company and Cities Service Oil CompanyAppellee
James P. HartAmicus Curiae
Railroad Commission of TexasAppellant
Austin E. StewartAppellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information