Case Information: 37136 | |||
Short Caption: | JIM (HARRY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 39641 , 48436 , 48629 , 50023 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR000933 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/08/2001 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/12/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/12/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 00-21731 | |
12/18/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 00-22091 | |
01/23/2001 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and appendix due: January 29, 2001. | 01-01425 | |
02/01/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 01-02135 | |
02/01/2001 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 01-02136 | |
02/01/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion Requesting the Court to Direct the Clerk of the Second Judicial District Court to forward the Letter, Evaluations, and Presentence Investigation Report contained in the Confidential Envelope in CR00-0933. | 01-02137 | |
02/15/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of the district court is directed to forward a certified copy of the presentence investigation report and the other materials contained in the confidential envelope in district court case number CR00-0933, in a sealed envelope, for filing and consideration with the appendix. | 01-03014 | |
02/21/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Sealed Envelope Contents. Mailed on: 02/201/01. | 01-03249 | |
02/22/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 01-03388 | |
03/15/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief due: 40 days. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party shall file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] fn2[Should either party cite to portions of transcripts not previously filed in this court, the party shall file a transcript request form for the necessary transcripts, pursuant to NRAP 9(a).] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. | 01-04660 | |
04/26/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: May 4, 2001. | 01-07018 | |
05/04/2001 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: 05/03/01. | 01-07502 | |
05/18/2001 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 05/17/01. | 01-08312 | |
06/11/2001 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: 06/07/01. | 01-09672 | |
10/08/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. | 01-16834 | |
10/08/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/16/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 01-19212 | |
12/13/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-19542 | |
12/13/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/18/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 21, 2001. | 01-19542 |