Case Information: 36190 | |||
Short Caption: | GABRIEL VS. CATALINA COATING & PLASTICS, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A364269 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/07/2000 / Kunin, Israel | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/26/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Berkley firm-check no. 3467. | ||
05/26/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-08979 | |
06/07/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
06/09/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. | 00-09818 | |
06/09/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 on cross-appeal from Lobello and Lobello--check no. 4340. | ||
06/13/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. | ||
09/07/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 00-15751 | |
09/07/2000 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 00-15752 | |
09/18/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Order Dismissing Appeal and Cross-Appeal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NNP/CLK | 00-16356 | |
09/18/2000 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |