judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JASON WAYNE CRAIG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-30)
Case Number:06-30Case Docketed On:02/15/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JASON WAYNE CRAIG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JASON WAYNE CRAIG, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJason Wayne CraigKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
Eric Alan Johnson
Geoffrey Gunnerson
Edward K. Britzius

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 122
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/14/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/15/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/15/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/03/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/04/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/18/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/18/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/30/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/05/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
08/02/2006Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppellantFinal
09/15/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/18/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/31/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/01/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/15/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/15/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
01/16/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Geoffrey L. Gunnerson and Edward K. Britzius, student interns, to appear on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
01/31/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/05/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/08/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, Original papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential File.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Donna D. Domonkos, for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Eric A. Johnson, Director, Geoffrey Gunnerson, and Edward K. Britzius, Students, argument by Mr. Britzius for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/31/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal - duplicate copy of transcript of sentencing. Original copy missing from recordRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/02/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/20/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/20/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/22/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for on 8/21/07 by Michelle Crotteu.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal