judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MURRAY, MAURICE UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0372
Short Caption:MURRAY, MAURICE UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Lead:81-CF-0372Consolidated: 82-CO-1582
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F39434-77Filed Date:02/18/1981

Opening Event Date:02/18/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/30/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/29/1983
Argued/Submitted:10/04/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MURRAY, MAURICE UNITED STATES
02/18/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/30/1981FiledRecord Completed
06/29/1983FiledBriefing Completed
10/04/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/05/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition