judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9917
A-9917
12/20/1963
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL.
CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/02/1964Response to Brief filedRespondent
09/10/1964Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
07/28/1964Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/25/1964Amended PetitionPetitioner
05/05/1964Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/27/1964Response to Brief filedPetitioner
04/17/1964Post submission brief filedRespondent
04/06/1964Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/17/1964Response to Reply filedRespondent
01/13/1964Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/06/1964Response to PetitionRespondent
12/20/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/15/1965Letter Filed
10/02/1964Response to Brief filed
09/10/1964Brief in Support of Petition
08/31/1964Response to Motion filed
07/28/1964Motion for Rehearing
07/15/1964Dissenting opinion issued.
07/15/1964Opinion issued
06/09/1964Response to Motion filed
05/25/1964Amended Petition
05/25/1964Miscellaneous Motion
05/05/1964Reply to Response
04/27/1964Response to Brief filed
04/17/1964Post submission brief filed
04/06/1964Supplemental Brief filed
02/26/1964Document received (See Remarks)
01/17/1964Response to Reply filed
01/13/1964Reply to Response
01/06/1964Response to Petition
12/20/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/20/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of Texas, et al.Petitioner
Connecticut General Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information