Case: 01-99-00264-CR
01-99-00264-CR
03/19/1999
DWI
Sweeney, Brian Keith
The State of Texas
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/05/2000 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
07/05/2000 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
06/05/2000 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
05/10/2000 | Petition for discretionary review disposed | Refused | |
02/24/2000 | Case file received by higher Court or agency. | | |
02/23/2000 | Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency | | |
01/06/2000 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
01/03/2000 | Date final opinion release for publication | | |
12/17/1999 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
11/12/1999 | Motion for Rehearing Due | | |
11/04/1999 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
10/28/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/28/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/11/1999 | Submitted | | |
10/11/1999 | Submission | | |
10/11/1999 | Submitted | | |
09/07/1999 | Submission | | |
08/27/1999 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
08/27/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/27/1999 | Extension to file brief disposed-brief here | Grant motion | |
08/27/1999 | Supplemental Clerks Record Filed | | |
08/27/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/24/1999 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
08/18/1999 | Correspondence | | |
08/05/1999 | Brief Due | | |
07/06/1999 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
07/06/1999 | Brief received only-oral argument requested | | |
07/04/1999 | Brief Due | | |
06/04/1999 | Extension Granted - No Further Extensions Of Time Will be Entertained | Grant motion | |
05/25/1999 | Brief Due | | |
05/24/1999 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
05/07/1999 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
04/25/1999 | Brief Due | | |
04/23/1999 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
04/13/1999 | Docketing statement filed | | |
03/26/1999 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |
03/26/1999 | Record due | | |
03/26/1999 | Reporter's record filed (statement of facts) | | |
03/19/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
01/26/1999 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
01/25/1999 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | | |
01/15/1999 | Petition for discretionary review due | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/05/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
District Clerk, District | District clerk | |
JUDGE, TRIAL | Trial court judge | |
SWEENEY, BRIAN KEITH | Criminal - Appellant | Scot R. Courtney |
REPORTER, COURT | Court reporter | |
COORDINATOR, TRIAL COURT | Trial court coordinator | |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | John B. Holmes Calvin A. Hartmann |
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 5
Harris
Honorable ELEANOR JANICE LAW
9836903
180 days