Case Information: 37118 | |||
Short Caption: | LEE (ROBERT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C164382 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/07/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/07/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 00-21376 | |
12/07/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: August 10, 2000 and August 11, 2000. Court Reporter: Diann Prock. Filed in district court on: December 1, 2000. | 00-21377 | |
12/12/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: August 10, 2000 and August 11, 2000. Court Reporter: Diann Prock. | 00-21686 | |
01/11/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 01-00704 | |
01/11/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 01-00705 | |
01/24/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 01-01557 | |
03/06/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming and Remanding to Correct Judgment of Conviction. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of entering a corrected judgment of conviction." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML | 01-04086 | |
04/03/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-04208 | |
04/03/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 6, 2001. | 01-04208 |