Case Information: 37138 | |||
Short Caption: | DR PARTNERS VS. WASHOE COUNTY | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9708810 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/30/2001 / Gruesen, Thomas | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/08/2002 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/13/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bader & Ryan--check no. 09553. | ||
12/13/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. | 00-21801 | |
12/20/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: George V. Allison. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
01/30/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Thomas W. Gruesen, Sr.. | ||
02/15/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 14, 2001. | 01-02991 | |
03/23/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 01-05177 | |
03/23/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days | ||
04/04/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-05754 | |
04/06/2001 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 01-05953 | |
04/24/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certificate of Compliance with NRAP 9(a). | 01-06922 | |
07/16/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 01-12071 | |
08/02/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Motion Granted in Part. On July 16, 2001, appellant filed a motion requesting a one hundred twenty day extension to file the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall have until December 4, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Failure to demonstrate extreme and unforeseeable circumstances for additional extensions of time may result in denial of the motion. | 01-13055 | |
12/04/2001 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 12/04/01. | 01-20295 | |
12/04/2001 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 01-20297 | |
12/14/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 4, 2002. | 01-21105 | |
02/06/2002 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 02/04/02. Signed by: John B. Rhodes. | 02-02403 | |
02/22/2002 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 21, 2002. | 02-03397 | |
03/21/2002 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 03/21/02. Signed by: Kevin P. Ryan. | 02-05087 | |
07/08/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 02-11556 | |
07/08/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/10/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-15641 | |
10/08/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-15816 | |
10/08/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/14/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 9, 2002. | 02-15816 |