judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KIRMANI VS. KIRMANI

Case Information: 37135
Short Caption:KIRMANI VS. KIRMANICourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D248387Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/26/2000 / Davidson, MichaelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/10/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/12/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Beckley firm-check no. 079742.
12/12/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. 00-21732
12/26/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael D. Davidson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
04/13/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 21, 2001. 01-06439
08/30/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-14736
08/30/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
09/14/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Because this is a child custody matter, appellant shall have 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days after service of the opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have 10 days after service of the answering brief to file and serve the reply brief. 01-15537
09/19/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15825
09/27/2001Other Other. Filed Copy of Notice of Withdrawal from the Law Firm of Dempsey, Roberts & Smith filed in the District Court on April 27, 2001. 01-16287
10/01/2001Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 01-16462
10/03/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/11/00; 02/14/00; 03/24/00; 07/10/00; and 10/20/00. To Court Reporter: Deborah Casper. 01-16655
12/03/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: January 11, 2000 and March 24, 2000. Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. 01-20178
12/12/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: October 10, 2000. Court Reporter: Alice F. Eastgate. 01-20902
12/14/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-21093
12/17/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed December 14, 2001. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by January 9, 2002. 01-21234
01/11/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 01/09/02. 02-00851
01/11/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 3. 02-00853
01/31/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-02051
02/04/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed January 31, 2002. Respondent shall file and serve the answering brief by February 11, 2002. 02-02202
02/13/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-02841
02/13/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 02/11/02. Signed by: Francis-Ann Fine. 02-02844
02/28/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-03722
03/04/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed February 28, 2002. Appellant shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file and serve the reply brief. 02-03889
03/08/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 03/05/02. Signed by: Daniel F. Polsenberg. 02-04270
07/10/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-11785
07/10/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/21/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Reversal and Remand. "ORDER this matter REVERSED AND REMANDED WITH INSTRUCTIONS to the district court to conduct a full evidentiary hearing and make specific findings of fact with regard to the child custody and child support issues." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-14276
09/17/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-14823
09/17/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/27/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 19, 2002. 02-14823