judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GILMORE VS. GILMORE

Case Information: 37134
Short Caption:GILMORE VS. GILMORECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D244866Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/04/2001 / Elliott-Tavano, JenniferSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/12/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
12/12/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-21687
12/13/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from William I. Gilmore--Western Union Money Order No. 06-190138850.
12/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-22177
12/22/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-22323
12/26/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Gayle Nathan. 00-22425
12/26/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Docketing Statement. 00-22428
01/02/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 22, 2000 and August 14, 2000. To Court Reporter: Theodora M. Law. 01-00069
01/04/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jennifer Elliott-Tavano. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/09/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on: 1/4/01. 01-00428
01/19/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Remove Case from Mandatory Settlement Program. 01-01259
01/29/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On January 19, 2001, appellant filed a motion to remove this appeal from the settlement conference program. The settlement judge assigned to an appeal may recommend that the appeal be removed from the program. Thus, any request for removal must be directed to the settlement judge. Accordingly, we deny the motion. 01-01834
02/02/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 22, 2000 (vols. 1 and 2) and August 14, 2000. Court Reporter: Deborah Casper. 01-02200
03/14/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Transcripts). 01-04529
04/02/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 11, 2001. 01-05655
04/09/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-06125
05/22/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Status Report. We order this appeal stayed pursuant to the mandatory provisions of federal bankruptcy law. Counsel for appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file a report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. 01-08560
10/25/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. To date, appellant's counsel has not complied with the May 22, 2001 order directing appellant's counsel to file a report informing this court of the status of appellant's bankruptcy proceeding. Appellant's counsel shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the requested status report or to show cause why sanctions shoould not be imposed. 01-17946
11/05/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Appellant's Discharge of Debtor was filed on July 5, 2001. 01-18475
11/21/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-19632
12/14/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. On November 5, 2001, appellant filed a status report informing this court that a Discharge of Debtor was entered by the United States Bankruptcy Court on July 5, 2001. This appeal shall proceed. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 70 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-21116
02/25/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 02-03519
03/11/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 02-04306
03/11/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
03/12/2002RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2 this day. 02-04489
04/01/2002RemittiturFiled Letter: Entered Receipt for Documents. Received by County Clerk on March 20, 2002. 02-04489