judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BATTLE (JACK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 37125
Short Caption:BATTLE (JACK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36952
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C153106Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/16/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/07/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/07/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-21426
01/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 37075, 37097, 37099, 37125, 37127, 37141, 37163. 01-00266
04/16/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 4/12/01. 01-06479
04/16/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/03/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-00149
01/29/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00653
01/29/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/13/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 1, 2002. 02-00653