Case: 05-01-00198-CV
05-01-00198-CV
02/05/2001
Miscellaneous civil
Rosell, Brian and Kienitz, Annette
Central West Motor Stages, Inc. d/b/a Central West of Texas, Inc. and Lloyd Earl Rieve
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/18/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
07/15/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |||
07/15/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |||
05/08/2003 | petition for review disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
01/24/2003 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
01/08/2003 | Petition for Review Filed | | |||
01/07/2003 | Petition for Review Due | | |||
12/16/2002 | Opinion to Publishers | | |||
12/10/2002 | Ext to File Petition for Review Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/09/2002 | Ext to File Petition for Review | | |||
10/25/2002 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||
10/23/2002 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | | ||
10/15/2002 | Response to Motion | | |||
10/08/2002 | Response to Motion | | |||
10/04/2002 | Response to Motion | | |||
09/18/2002 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | | ||
09/03/2002 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||
08/29/2002 | Letter Filed | | |||
08/28/2002 | Notice Filed | | |||
08/22/2002 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
08/22/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||
08/22/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||
06/20/2002 | Motion for Leave to File | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
06/20/2002 | Motion for Leave to File | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
06/06/2002 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
06/06/2002 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
06/06/2002 | Response to Motion | | |||
05/24/2002 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
05/24/2002 | Brief Received | | |||
05/24/2002 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
05/17/2002 | Notice Filed | | |||
05/16/2002 | Submitted | | |||
05/16/2002 | Submission | | |||
05/16/2002 | Submitted | | |||
04/11/2002 | Letter Filed | | |||
04/03/2002 | Letter Filed | | |||
03/26/2002 | Letter Filed | | |||
03/22/2002 | Brief Filed | | |||
03/22/2002 | Submission | | |||
03/16/2002 | amended brief due | | |||
03/15/2002 | Letter Received | | |||
03/12/2002 | Amended Brief Filed | | |||
03/12/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |||
03/12/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |||
03/06/2002 | Defective Brief Notice | | |||
03/04/2002 | Brief Filed | | |||
03/02/2002 | Brief Due | | |||
02/21/2002 | Letter Filed | | |||
02/21/2002 | Brief Due | | |||
02/19/2002 | Record Returned | | |||
02/15/2002 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
02/14/2002 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
02/14/2002 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
02/11/2002 | Notice Filed | | |||
01/31/2002 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/30/2002 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
01/30/2002 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
01/22/2002 | Brief Filed | | |||
01/22/2002 | Letter Filed | | |||
01/22/2002 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/16/2002 | Brief Received | | |||
01/14/2002 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
01/14/2002 | Brief Due | | |||
01/14/2002 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
12/14/2001 | Brief Due | | |||
12/10/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/07/2001 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
12/07/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
11/14/2001 | Brief Due | | |||
11/01/2001 | Record Checked Out | | |||
10/31/2001 | Record Returned | | |||
10/30/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/29/2001 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
10/29/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
10/19/2001 | Letter Filed | | |||
10/16/2001 | Record Checked Out | | |||
10/15/2001 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
09/06/2001 | Notice Filed | | |||
06/18/2001 | Notice Filed | | |||
05/15/2001 | Letter Received | | |||
05/11/2001 | Notice Filed | | |||
03/27/2001 | Notice to reporter that record is late | | |||
03/23/2001 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
03/16/2001 | Record due | | |||
02/14/2001 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |||
02/14/2001 | Amended Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
02/14/2001 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
02/06/2001 | 125.00 Filing Fee Due | | |||
02/06/2001 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |||
02/05/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
02/05/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
02/05/2001 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
12/15/2000 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |||
11/16/2000 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/16/2016 | Case Stored | Clerk record or reporter record returned to district/county clerk; case destroyed |
07/15/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored |
08/20/2008 | Status | Destroy record |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Liesa Mueller | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Lisa Mueller |
Karen Bay | Appellee | Eric Gordon Walraven Robert Fugate |
Rosell, Brian And Kienitz Ann | Appellant | William J. Dunleavy |
Central West Motor Stages, Inc | Appellee | Britton Byron Harris |
Brian Rosell & Annette Kienitz | Appellant | Thomas B. Cowart |
Trial Court Information
162nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Bill Rhea
DV-98-07903-I