Case: 99-0246
99-0246
03/19/1999
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
E. I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY
ROBERT L. ABERNATHY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/07/2000 | Reply to Response | Respondent | Respondents' reply to mo for re-hearing on pet for review | |
03/01/2000 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | on behalf of E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Co. | |
01/18/2000 | Reply Brief | Petitioner | "Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits" | |
12/16/1999 | Appendix Filed | Respondent | Robert Abernathy, et al.'s appendix vol 1 & 2 (12), to their brief | |
12/16/1999 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | Robert Abernathy, et al.'s brief on the merits | |
11/12/1999 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | Petitioner's brief on the merits | |
08/10/1999 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Robert L. Abernathy, Et Al's response to petition for review. | |
05/07/1999 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix attached to petition | |
05/07/1999 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of E. I. Dupont De Nemours & Co. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/19/2002 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | Master index to records in COA nos. 09-98-061, 09-98-062, 09-98-063, 09-98-064 returned to the 9th COA. | | |
08/17/2000 | Case Stored | 39-B (9/19/02 case re-stored) | | |
08/10/2000 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | order mailed to the COA | | |
05/12/2000 | Notice of Appearance | Mr. Karl Novak vice Joseph Rice | | |
04/27/2000 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | Justice Hecht notes his dissent. | |
04/07/2000 | Reply to Response | Respondents' reply to mo for re-hearing on pet for review | | |
03/23/2000 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Response due on April 7, 2000 | | |
03/01/2000 | Motion for Rehearing | on behalf of E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Co. | | |
03/01/2000 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | | | |
02/11/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposed | Filing granted | Petitioner's m/e/t to file mo/re was granted until 02/28/00; mo/re is due 02/28/00. | |
02/10/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing | unopposed m/e/t to file mo/re on behalf of E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Co. | | |
01/27/2000 | Motion to strike disposed | dismissed as moot | Mo to strike appendices | |
01/27/2000 | Petition for Review disposed | Dismissed for Want of Jurisdiction | W/Mo to strike appendices dismissed as moot. | |
01/24/2000 | Motion to Strike filed | E. I. Du Pont de Nemours & Company's motion to strick appendices from responde nts' brief on the merits | | |
01/18/2000 | Reply Brief | "Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits" | | |
12/27/1999 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | m/e/t to file reply brief on the merits is granted; reply is due 1-14-2000 | |
12/27/1999 | additional briefing due to be filed | E. I. Dupont De Nemours and Company's reply brief is due January 14, 2000. | | |
12/23/1999 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Petitioner's m/e/t to file reply brief on the merits | | |
12/16/1999 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Robert L. Abernathy, et al; m/e/t to file brief was granted until 12/15/99; re spondents' brief on the merits is due n/l/t 12/15/99 | |
12/16/1999 | Appendix Filed | Robert Abernathy, et al.'s appendix vol 1 & 2 (12), to their brief | | |
12/16/1999 | Brief on the Merits | Robert Abernathy, et al.'s brief on the merits | | |
12/15/1999 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Respondents' Robert L. Abernathy, et al. m/e/t to file brief on the merits | | |
11/12/1999 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner's brief on the merits | | |
09/21/1999 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | petitioner's m/e/t to file brief on the merits is granted; pet's brief is due 11-10-99; respondents' brief is due 11-30-99; reply is due 12-15-99 | |
09/17/1999 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | unopposed m/e/t to file brief on the merits on behalf of E. I. du Pont de Nemours & Co. | | |
09/15/1999 | Document received (See Remarks) | Master Index to record in COA Nos. 09-98-061; 09-98-062; 09-98-063; and 09-98-064; this Index is in Clerk's Office | | |
09/10/1999 | Brief on the Merits Requested | petitioner's brief is due 10-11-99; respondent's brief is due 11-1-99; petitioner's reply is due 11-16-99 | | |
09/10/1999 | Record Requested in Petition for Review | Spoke to Annette; she advised that record was extremely large (14 boxes); Master Index requested at this time. | | |
08/26/1999 | Petitioner's reply brief | Du Pont's reply to response to petition for review. | | |
08/10/1999 | Response to Petition | Robert L. Abernathy, Et Al's response to petition for review. | | |
07/08/1999 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Because respondent's counsel did not receive 06/15/99 notice, due date for response has been extended to 08/09/99. NO FEE. | | |
06/15/1999 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Response due 07/15/99; NO FILING FEE. | | |
06/08/1999 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
05/07/1999 | Appendix Filed | Appendix attached to petition | | |
05/07/1999 | Petition for Review | On behalf of E. I. Dupont De Nemours & Co. | | |
05/07/1999 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Requested a disc, overnighting 05-07-99 | | |
03/23/1999 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | M/E/T, as supplemented, to file petition for review is granted. Petition is due 05/05/99. | |
03/23/1999 | Petition due | Petition for review is due 05/05/99. | | |
03/19/1999 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | on behalf of E. I. du Pont de Nemours. | | |
03/19/1999 | Supplement to Motion filed | SUPPLEMENT TO DUPONT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE PETITION FOR REVIE | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
08/17/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 39-B |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Kay, Joey Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Porter, John Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, Jimmie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Munn, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Arletha V. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Brenda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Evans, III, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fikes, Robert L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knox, Joseph Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bates, Darrell E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Robert Burton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boglin, Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Paulding, Craig | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Yelder, Gloria | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Barbara F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lawshee, William F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benton, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, James Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Young, Willie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Jr., Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Lester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, WILLIAM H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rutledge, Spurgon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Augustus, Charlie J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Jr., Thaddeus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Castleberry, Johnny Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moss, Frank Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Johnnie Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goodwin, Hillard E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Godwin, Ruby G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Jake | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pruitt, Willie Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, Morris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Marcus, James Edwards | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rodgers, Loretta Clemons | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pugh, Alton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bearden, Henry Clifford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watkins, John Herbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, Gregory | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lamar, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Owens, Marie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Armstrong, W. A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watts, Jr., Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chaney, Jr., Obray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blackledge, Victor | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Early | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Onzell Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spargo, Donald Evans | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, David Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blackmon, Jesse | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bolden, Lorenne Ellen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chapman, Teddy Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rainey, Willie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, Jack Lamar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Underwood, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reed, Preston Grandville | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stover, Mose Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gibson, James Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herbert, Eddie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woodall, Elbert Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Argo, Joe Price | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knopf, Thelma Juanita | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spencer, Andrea | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Rufus Jackson Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hunter, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dobbins, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Warner, Mercia V. Goodwin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garner, Joseph Carl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pozak, Wilburn Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shugart, Willard Floyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Partain, David E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Catherine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dillard, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roper, Howard Phillip | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Eleanor W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mullins, Robert A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clayton, Napoleon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Ollie Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, Ewel Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Woodrow | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Carolyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Elizabeth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parish, Ruthie Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCurdy, Nommie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gooden, Isaac | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glasgo, Roland A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Corwin, Wilson Paul | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ward, Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bunn, William Cecil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knox, Audie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burton, Jimmie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roberson, Harold S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamilton, Wanda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Helms, Howard Dow | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pruitt, Rosemary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hagler, Andrew James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Leo, Ben Anthony | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Earley, Kenneth Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Laird, Calvin Stewart | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rhone, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shelton, Roy Wesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glenn, Ruth Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Emmal, James Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Berga, Jr., Vernon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hollie, L. C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Eatmon, Jimmy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dickey, George R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Farley, Billy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lipkin, Ike | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, James Alwyne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Louvert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, Eric | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Gennie Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Butts, Ted Martin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anderton, Wayne M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hannah, Edna Mozelle | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Corine Anderson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Avant, Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kilgore, Ronald Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burchfield, Grady Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burch, Rebecca C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alfano, Lisa Gail Williams | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Gertrude Hope | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMullin, Jr., Abraham | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Horn, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Peter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamp, Charles E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Camp, Earle Duncan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pope, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Best, Jewel Durward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Oglesby, Earl Edker | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCullough, William Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maiden, Jr., Percy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burrell, Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Jr., William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pugh, Alton Sidney | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Denney, John Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nalls, Ando | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Witherspoon, Jr., Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nesmith, William M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spraggins, Nannie L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dinkins, Randy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harrison, Herbert S. III | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carlisle, John Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hendrix, Walter James Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Winfred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Capps, William M. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goode, Marshall | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMickens, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kelley, Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parham, Johnnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Mary Adell Stephanie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reynolds, Ben Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pickel, Roy Owen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawson, Sylvester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sizemore, Thomas Leslie Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Allen Edwin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMurry, Gordon Herbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cobb, Gus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walford, Jr., Peter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Marks, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kelley, George Rex | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Eaton, John Morgan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tolbert, George Washington Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawson, Linda W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goodwin, Prentella | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Jimmie Lee Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fox, L. D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Calvin Elee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campisi, Joseph John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harper, Leonard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Edwin Harmon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sykes, Melvin Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glaze, Hugh Nelson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
LEWIS, RICHARD | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Elliott, Mary C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morrison, Warren L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lowe, Jenie Godwin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Ben R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hutchins, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Elkins, Henry James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crocker, Maurice Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alexander, Emma A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moats, Semion Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pugh, Willie Hicks | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carlton, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Ernest Cleveland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Echols, R. W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Otwell, James Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ross, Sheila Layne Downs | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winter, Frank Cletius | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maul, Auguster Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Joseph H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Abbott, Frelon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
LEWIS, CHARLES | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Shilrey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payne, William Tandy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Lidie Watson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Golston, Jerry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Green, William Patrick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cooley, Floyd Wesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pugh, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wallace, Mardis Bryan Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Headley, Norris Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, JAMES | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, Frank Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Melvin Bob | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Arrick, David Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Richardson, Alma Irene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pate, Clyde M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blevins, Helen Daniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Odgers, Shirley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lott, D. D. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kincaid, Willie B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dancy, Jr., Ed | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nalls, Marilyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Todd, Jr., Rogers | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shaw, Charles Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hutto, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shaw, Eljerry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knight, Wilburn Ragland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Love, Winifred D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rutledge, Doris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, Jr., Rubin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Roland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Camp, Viola | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Janice M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kent, William A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilkins, Alfred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shade, Dwight | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glenn, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drake, James Major | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mason, George Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Paige, Otis Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Fhone | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Massey, Windell Murphey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClain, Emanuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harrison, Mark A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burford, Dewey E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Henry Floyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Langham, James Hubert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMillan, Leon Cornealius Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holmes, James D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cunningham, Vallie J. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holloway, Jr., Moses | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Ellie B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Sterling | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Byron E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Foster, Grover | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCloud, Beverly A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Robert Gene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wills, Robert Lowell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garrett, Joe Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peoples, Jr., Otis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, John Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shamy, Abraham Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blakely, Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Oden, Lucius B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Mary Sue | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Washington, George Amos | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Sandra | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Edwards, Harold Lloyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Robert Alva | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, Lawrence Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Palmer Clinton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Robert L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glover, Jr., Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blackwell, Allen Mason | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Terrell, Paula Annette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carroll, Joseph Timothy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, George D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Craig, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Cleo Farrell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Middleton, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pinkard, Larry D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
ABERNATHY, ROBERT L. | Respondent | Mr. J. William Lewis Mr. Glen W. Morgan Mr. Alto V. Watson III Mr. Joseph F. Rice Mr. Karl E. Novak Mr. Richard J. Clarkson Mr. Alto V. Watson II Mr. William Lewis |
Carter, John David Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watts, Julius | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nuckols, Murray Eugene Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McBride, Annie Jo Battles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jenkins, Willie M. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Duff, Willie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Samuel E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lavender, Sarah Belinda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fleet, Ranolda Sanford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wiley, Iverson H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Robie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Driver, Napolean Christopher | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Aaron | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, Earnest John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thornton, James F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Calvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Charles Edwin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Powe, Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Colvin, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bird, Murray Taylor | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fowler, Vera N. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davidson, Demario K. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Sam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Cassandra | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bosworth, Wayne Gordon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Newton, Annie Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamm, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chappell, Leon Roscoe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Little, Askia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bowie, Evell Douglass Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Byrd, Derreck D. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bloom, Clinton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Jr., Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Seagle, Harold Redford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Poe, Richard Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Frank Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bousack, Earl Edwin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Macon, John Erskine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cummings, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hale, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Houston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kreider, Jesse Evans Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Theodore | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawson, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Bennie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cleveland, James Carl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mullinax, James Lymon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hood, Louis William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hoops, Morris Edgar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fisher, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spraggins, Brian D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henton, Corey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hooks, Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shepard, Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Worford, Luther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Houlditch, Frank W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rush, Essie D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, James Troy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Odessa | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cook, Howard Allen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Battles, Betty Lou D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Capps, Frank William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stamps, Charles Frederick Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pickens, Michael Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Latham, Jackie John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dennis, Charlie Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Ulane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kemp, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Hollie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Horton, Amos Adolphus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCray, Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Abbott, David Rickey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rice, Carol | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Griffith, James W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winston, Charles Anthel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hilton, Jane Marilyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mayfield, Diane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Singleton, Grady | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCloud, Eddie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hollie, Jessica | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alexander, George Otha | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pyatt, Roberta Dobbins | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shade, Albert Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crowder, Linda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Layfield, Carolyn E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Key, Captain Gurdley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, James Eagle | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kelley, Lois Marie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hutchinson, Teresa McEachern | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cobern, Dortha B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCafferty, Barbara Fay | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anthony, Charles Jailette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kittler, J. D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ford, Cliff | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Glenn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Criss, Jr., Dane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rush, Tommie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, Marsha Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lindsey, Odes C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Weldon, Jesse L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Richard Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mason, James E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Killings, Jake | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shaddix, Frances | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reynolds, Lesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coggin, Grover C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Owens, Anita | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Salter, Oscar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garrard, Ronald Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mike, Clinton J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McAlpine, W. Ester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Major | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Joyce A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, James Monroe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Dorothy M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanford, Jr., Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burlingame, Ralph G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
DeLoach, Jr., James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, George Wendell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Canada, Edward W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payne, Clyde James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pruitt, Avery | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wrench, Margery | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Orton, Talmadge | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Jocelyn Payton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hardin, Ronald Dale | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wadsworth, John Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hurbert, Lonnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campbell, Paul Pierson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Osburn, Robert Douglas Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ware, Harold Moss | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Foster, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Willie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Woodrow Weldon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cheatham, William Lloyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Isbell, J. R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drake, Willie Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sherrod, Vergal Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Henry Clayton Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dempsey, Joseph Wiley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Rosalyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, James Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Southall, Roderick Demster | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lawrence, John Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woodall, Allen Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Camp, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogeland, Barry W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Thomas E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lindgren, Carl N. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hampton, Jimmy Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moberg, William L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Leonard, Raymond Clyde | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Key, Thelma G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Willie Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wheeler, A. B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCoy, Wade | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pate, Phillip E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Densmore, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lacey, Chester Robert Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, Herby J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nunley, Cecil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patrick, Ralph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Young, Ellis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Horton, Tom Watson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Battle, Preastley H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamlett, Donna | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hunter, Willie A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woods, Douglas Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cooper, B. C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawson, Clara B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Doss, Dorothy Nell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, Rose Anna | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Johnnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pippens, Arnold J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carroll, Robert Everett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crum, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, John Taylor | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watts, Jesse James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Vancier Monyette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Robert Lewis Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
St. John, Larry Raymond | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogue, Horace Denman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Little, Claude Wallace | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gibbs, Theodore Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, McConnell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lassic, Eddie William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gosnell, Virginia Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Frederick Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dobbins, Rosa Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Earl F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Connie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dorricott, Billy Jim | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Strength, Rembert Dewey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, Mack | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, Thomas J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alldredge, Carl Huett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burchfield, Albert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ritch, William Aubrey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Sherry E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, MARY | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ganus, Ottis Luther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Flowers, Timothy Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knox, Bruce | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Noah Harris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Littleton, Edward Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chandle, Eddie Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Banks, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McKinney, Timothy Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sherrer, James William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Flack, Kenneth Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Harry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brascome, James Wesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nathan, Booker T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kirby, Peggie Jean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Abroms, Levan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lindsey, Hubert L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Craig, Jerry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burnett, Howard Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spain, Dennis Michael | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Wilbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamilton, Jr., Orville | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gossett, Johnny Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cavender, Billy Lincoln | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harrison, Wanda Joyce | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Bester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walker, Robert Paul | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
England, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Diggins, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, Stephen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McIlwain, Edmond B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Craver, Celeste | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Page, Jerry Louis Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anderson, Lovell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cockrell, Walter Joseph Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brannon, Sandra June Williams | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Cleon Waldron | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McAdory, Madison | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vines, Jack D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Donaldson, Clanton Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mixion, Christine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Huey, Cornelius | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shearer, Richard E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baker, James Elkin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herron, Clara | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hardin, John C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scarbrough, Shelley Paul | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bean, Harold Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, David Woodrow | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McAdory, Ivory | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nichols, Joseph Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Price, Norris D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cooper, Herman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Oden, Ocie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carr, Newton Jackson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Mack Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lawson, Willie E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Jr., Marshall | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gary, Willie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jefferson, Jordan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dates, Peggy Faye | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peterson, Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kilgore, Robert I. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, Shirley Mines | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Young, Joseph Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, Ellis Escoe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drinkard, Claude B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Richard Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
York, Perry Everett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waters, William L. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mowery, Arnold D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hampton, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Banks, Lovell Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Jr., Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gallups, Ellis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rush, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Higgins, Tracie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shade, Ivan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
House, Linda Kay | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bennett, Eugene Matthew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allen, G. A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Edwards, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rogers, Henry James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
DeMotte, Thomas Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fomby, Henry Pearl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fallon, Donald William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, Iris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Powell, Henry F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crooks, William Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Braxton, Lovell Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Elvin H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Duncan, Aundre | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beard, Edith Inez | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cole, Ira Rheroic | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ellis, Tom | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, Annie Wright | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Douglas, Donald E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boswell, James Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allen, Willie Jasper | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Judkins, Eliza Tut | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McAphee, Lester B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watkins, Eugene H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Odell, Floyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patrick, Fred Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Butera, Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sims, John Edwin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Early | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burdette, Chester Ervin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lofton, Herbert M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chappell, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Greene, Jessie Joe Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Simmons, Richard Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shade, Jr., Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pace, Carver Dubois | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wallace, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Champion, John Benjamin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Jr., Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chisam, Willie Washington | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coachman, Streety | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Massey, Thomas James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sims, Pat | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Hugh S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Simpson, Mickey S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kay, Archie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payton, Clinton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mays, William Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parsons, James Luther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wormely, David Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herring, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carlisle, Arthur Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watts, Amos | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stovall, James Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boartfield, Jesse Raymond | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Snyder, Billy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Truss, Carolyn Ann Lavender | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beasley, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCurdy, Willie George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, Norman L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McKinney, Jack | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hacker, Stephen M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogan, Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, Jr., Clifford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stallworth, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nance, Vincent | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smelley, Donald Alphus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, Howard G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Gordon Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dobbins, Muggie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCurdy, Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, WILLIAM | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mabson, Edgar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Guin, Leon Rowland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Rita | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dobson, Walter Franklin Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lott, Carrie M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Culver, Joseph Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Green, William Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Nellie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brady, Charles H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moon, Angela | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Craig, Horace Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walker, Andy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Myers, Charles Sidney | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bolden, Sidney L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lloyd, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sundberg, Morris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
George, Roy Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cheatwood, Winston Darrell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pyron, Rex Haywood | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fisher, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gomon, Edward Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drake, Jr., James M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
LaRussa, Sam A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stanley, Eugene Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Olvey, John Bert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Belinda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chatta, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wormely, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, Wellington | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Breland, Robert Kernis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Manning, Elven | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henton, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McSwain, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reeves, Willie Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Halcromb, Gloria | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bonner, J. T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, George Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Young, Bobby | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Misso, Warren Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pole, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rutledge, Rosemary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Victisa | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kindrick, Glenda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wylie, Carol | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hooks, Bobbie Jean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jefferson, Pitts | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Prince, Renee A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harmon, Dan William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, William Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Odom, John Gibson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vines, Horace Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lampkin, Joel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCoy, John Olen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Gregory P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spraggins, James E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Huett, Clarence Edgar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Elie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whisonant, Doris Y. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Patricia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Malone, Leslie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Amos, Cathy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Jr., Jettie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Potts, Lafayette Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perdue, Fred Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Green, Richard Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ware, Jr., James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holloway, Lorene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Letson, Mildred Ernestine Engl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Marshall Odas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Curren, Barry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCullar, Dewaine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Triplett, Gene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Austin, Betty Ruth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Willie Lester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Mildred Spraggins | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vaughn, Gerald Webster | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morrison, Billy Dot | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Willie J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Leroy Columbus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, James Claudus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whittaker, Earnest O'Neal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wrench, Christa Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, Mary Frances | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pickens, Billy Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Defoor, Franklin Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cobern, James W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Russell, Davies Preston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wallace, James Marvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bolden, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawson, Andre Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Townes, Charlie Alfred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Junuies, Bobby L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Weedie H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roberts, Espie Junior | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Black, Theodore | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Douglas, Rollyn Gilbert Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, Jesse James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shotts, I. J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Ned Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, Theodore | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glaze, Birley W. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cardwell, Edsel Dewell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bennett, Jr., Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rollins, Jessie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, James Randall | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mason, Randy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nobles, Warren Rodney | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Steward, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sturdivant, John A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Herman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Opolka, Joe Victor | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perry, Donald E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Norman Haywood | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alson, Addie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gibson, Alfred Ealon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crawford, Jessie Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Long, Betty J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Angela | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Malone, Fannie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Powell, Jr., Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Mary A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Yarbrough, Harvey Allen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tift, James Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knox, Hayward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Ocie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Klemm, William Freddrick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Upshaw, George P. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Alene T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hardy, Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hyde, Frank Edwin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thigpan, Vita Altheia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Elliott, Cleman Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawkins, Charles Frederick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sims, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whitfield, Henry Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kendrick, William Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCampbell, Diane E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boyd, Lucy Johnson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, Jesse | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Jr., Webster | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drummond, Robert E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Swain, Jim | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cole, James Lee Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Leo L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ward, Eugene Jackson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lawrence, Terrance W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Lester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waite, Berney Beverly | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rudolph, Carvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Trussell, Marion Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, James Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hall, Murray C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, Jackie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carnes, Samuel Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Prince, J. C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maxwell, Sam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Willis, Richmond | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rickard, Herson Elvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Braswell, Benjamin Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mayfield, Morrice Duel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watts, James E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wallace, Monroe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alexander, Lucian Pierce | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cole, Charles Anderson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryan, Bennie Wallace | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Adamson, Verdie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Judy Elizabeth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Houghton, Harry Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
DeLoach, Lula | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bush, Suzanne Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Preston, Felton Orel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Mark | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Arville | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilmore, Hugh M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chance, Shirley Faye | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hunter, Boykin L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walker, James Oscar Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Sandy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vines, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shope, James Willis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wyatt, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walker, Jr., Ollie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Saunders, Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, Cleophus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Edgar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Hosea Holcombe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stevens, Rhonda L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Green, Sylvester H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dillard, John Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ward, Robert C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glover, Wilson Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Webb, David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Caldwell, Thomas Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Benjamin F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Avant, Mamie R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Amberson, Mary Frits | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crear, Robert James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tyler, Thomas H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClaney, Rommell James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Biggs, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogue, Henry Coleman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fitzhugh, Alexander Eggleston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holmes, Gordon F. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, John D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ray, Debra Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henton, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henry, Betty | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fondren, Robert Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dorsey, Edward M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rodgers, Roosevelt V. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crabtree, Jesse L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Oakes, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chandler, Gordon Cecil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sizemore, Virginia Sue | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kennedy, John Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baylor, Alberta | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stevenson, Willie David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Thelma H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Layton, Jimmie O'Neal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Milton, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Butler, Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Gary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pinkard, Randolph S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wynn, Junious C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harkins, Frank Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winfield, Robert D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dutton, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, Howard Truman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bland, Horace | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Richard Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perkins, Martha Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mines, Earnest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Avant, Willie James Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Donnell, Josephine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Denton, James Sidney | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tubbs, Lester Bryant Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pickett, Linda Raye | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brock, Billy William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herring, L. D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cupps, Isaac Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Popee, Thomas Huey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ragland, Sam E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jordan, Ida Nelson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, Ellis Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Donaldson, Lewis Addie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Joseph B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hullum, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thornton, Frank Hubbard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davidson, Jeanette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Walter Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Grant, Willie Brooks | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Snedecor, Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, A. C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Horace Freddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogan, James Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harden, Elmer Jackson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Slaton, Harvey D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brake, Velma P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogeland, Gary Dewayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Samuel Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Sylvester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Nathan W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Randall, Ezell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burks, William H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Rufus Garden | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Jr., Woodrow | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fields, William Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Edwards, Louie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drake, Jr., Will | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alexander, Dan T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wells, Pamela Brown | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kirkpatrick, David Hewett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Laird, Ernest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lang, Jr., Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Alice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fowler, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Billingsley, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knight, Gerald Dewese | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
WILSON, JAMES | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Adams, Leodis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ray, Floyd C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, William Vance | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dennis, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Koss, Roy M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shipman, Joy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, Betty J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stephens, Eddie Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morning, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Booker T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilchrist, McKinley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bailey, Jr., George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Killings, Singleton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dansby, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stewart, Ross E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payton, Jr., Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nix, James E. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lark, James Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henton, Michael Dewayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holloway, Evelyn Thompson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Terrell, Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reeves, Minnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Floyd, John Page | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ferguson, James Vernon Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sloman, James Neil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fields, John Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, Tonya D. Parker | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Milas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crear, Edward G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morris, Clyde LeCroy Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Contorno, Peter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blankenship, Benjamin Berl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pate, Leon N. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holloway, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gaines, Jr., Mark | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shirley, Odus John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stevenson, Jr., Wilson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Jr., Melvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davidson, Billy Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glenn, Venoy H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hines, Willie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gaskins, Marshall Leslie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Roosevelt Franklin Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pearson, Virgil Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hardaway, Jimmy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allen, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Tommie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sharp, Kecalf | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Molden, Tommy Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McElroy, Jack Amburse | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Handley, Norman Glenn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Aubrey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kendrick, Billy Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dial, Clifton Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Theodore | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jordan, Jr., Moses | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stansel, Isom | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Clifford F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bush, Luther Preston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Evans, Shirley C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
George, Matthew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hood, Clarence Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, David West | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Street, Carl Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shaw, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Able, Arlie Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burney, Smart | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stamps, Jeffie F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Headrick, William Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Robert George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chapman, Horace | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ragland, Linder | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knight, Jr., Ocie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burt, Brantley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wyrosdic, Douglas Deleon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Green, Richard Gray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, Roland W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Paul H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
MILLER, JOHN A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rayburn, Cecil D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rogers, Freddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Horn, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holloway, Odom Gary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bunn, Emmett Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waters, Percy Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wadsworth, John Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hatchett, John Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Berga, Vernon Joseph Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, James Hilery | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shiver, Kenneth R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crumpton, Millard Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McAdoo, Angelo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lacey, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Townsend, Jr., Rufus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kirksey, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, Michael E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Flanningan, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Graham, Sarah Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carlton, James E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
England, Pierce J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harvey, Claude | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Toney, Earnest James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bloomingburg, Henry T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMath, Samuel Timothy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brewer, James Clinton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Perry Gene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Latracia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Murphy, David Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roland, Sam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Grissom, Linda Hardy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pope, Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Paul, Joe Riley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, Edgar Silas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, William A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pruitt, Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Johnny Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Richard Bernard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goodwin, Charles Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Downs, Michael Lynn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hendon, Kenneth Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, John Allan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cox, Michael David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Camp, Glenn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knezevich, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burnett, George Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Marvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parks, David Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glover, Tim | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williamson, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lollar, David Hudson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jemison, Norman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garner, Gordon Woodville | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tedford, James R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Bonzie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tate, Hallie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Connell, William Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Rube | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Douglas Wingwright | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Arrick, Mary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Evans, Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Marvin Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Alex | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamaker, Jr., Ed | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Isaac | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Southall, John Roderick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Silas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mines, Andy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Elder, Fred Morris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
England, Jr., John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mathews, Wilber McCoy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Belton, Jr., Mote | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Clarence Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tucker, Linda Gail | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Varner, Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stephens, Beauregard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drake, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Quick, James T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carroll, James Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vaughn, Stephanie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anderson, Jr., Lonnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, Mackson Steal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kantor, Carl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wells, Clifford Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brascome, James W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ward, James Phillip | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Means, Alex Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cottingham, Willie Milton Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Donia Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jenkins, Ralph Barnett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whisonant, Johnny Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCloud, Linda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, James William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilmore, Brevard Woodrow | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shivers, Willie S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Romanger, Willie C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Latham, Jack E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Weeks, Edgar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Foster, Sammie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Albert Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Rufus Lawrence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lucas, Dixie Don | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lacey, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hyde, Earl Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Antonio, Bernard Salvadore | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Dwight A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Johnny L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Estes, Reponza R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gann, James Larry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, Doe I. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knapp, Marion Crawford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burroughs, Judge | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perry, Benjamin Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Banks, Edward Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burns, Patricia Gary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Outling, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Bradley S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Judkins, Bolden | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Capps, Jerry Blake | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hardy, Joyce Baker | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bizzell, U. C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Colvin, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spraggins, David R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Washington, Jerry Davis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gresham, Horelice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, RALPH | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Farr, Jerry Wallace | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Worford, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mahaffey, Cedric | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jemison, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stack, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, James Emanuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clifton, Clinton R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burke, Rufus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stokes, Leland Woodard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Fred D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lawrence, Tashwania Inez | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bailey, Carrie W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Byers, Joseph Ralph Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, Norma J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Palmer, Charles Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lawley, Billy Gerald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reynolds, Willie Earnest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Conley, Robert Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Atkinson, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Richards, Herman Gray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cunningham, Tommie Gene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, Lawrence S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nuckols, Murray E. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Ollis Nelson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, James Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tucker, Larry Ronald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Higgins, William Pitner | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
DeLoach, Dollie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harding, Jack Cecil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burgess, Roy Earnest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winters, David Bernard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maxwell, Jr., Abraham | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, William Houston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mann, Samuel Woodrow | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morris, Queen Ester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robertson, Walter Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Snyder, Ruby Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drinkard, Theldon William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Murray, Gloria A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Templin, Rosa C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Riggins, James Arnold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pickens, Ivery Monroe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Donald G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Satterwhite, Leamon Jefferson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Simmons, Danny | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, Dudley Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, James Virgil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Starns, Gilbert Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davidson, Durand C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, James Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kendall, Ray Donald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McGehee, Ossie Floyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Myers, Thomas V. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, J. L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, William Harry Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sims, Albert L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rutledge, Oscar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Claude | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Joseph, Jr., Julius | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carson, Mary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cauthen, Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Howard Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bradberry, Embrew Rudolph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Frazier, Bobby Clayton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, Johnnie Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herron, Tracy Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Willis, James Ferdinand | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Torbert, John Orton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Earl, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barbour, James Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, James R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Young, Benjamin Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Witherspoon, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pace, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, John Hollis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Downs, Norman Deamos | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tyler, Homer Harrison | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hewitt, Arthur Norman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gordon, Jr., Saul | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Will | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Skates, Larry C. Skates | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Linn, Roy Brittian Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vines, Neal Gerald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hopkins, Eldridge Gene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Biffle, Jr., Marzean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Uleus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rice, Mamie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Eades, Bobbie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, James W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, James William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Myers, William Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hastings, Carl Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Samford, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harville, Erskine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crenshaw, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Powell, James Melvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cochran, Roy Glenn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ashurst, Carl Arnold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Flowers, Oliver | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rutledge, Minnie I. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, Norman Staples | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goode, Kay Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hollis, Jr., Johnnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Toyer, Jr., Grant | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Ronald Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Sarah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Field, Lee Erwin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Jr., James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Duffner, Joseph Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stevens, Robert Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brake, William C. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Heard, Sharon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Deneke, Patricia M. Pugh | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawson, Jr., Ben | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, Jr., Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ashcraft, Roy H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Atkins, Bobby | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howze, Ollie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peek, Franklin Joe Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baker, Robert Sandy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Andrews, Jr., Early | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pace, Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Love, Robert D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blue, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sullins, Jethro | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Hershley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Capps, Claude Jackson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beaton, Marjorie S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Willis, Alpha | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilder, Rebecca | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peeples, Roger Dale | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Jr., Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Early, Jr., John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ezekial, James P. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Argent, Willard Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kennedy, Pamela L. B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watson, Dalton Cecil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benefield, William John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Godwin, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanford, Edward L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Simpson, Margaret Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lawson, Claude E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rembert, LeRoy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bender, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Chesley Calvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Armstrong, Audis Fulton Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Connell, Ruby Eloise | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perkins, Lestyne H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shiver, Esther L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Ramona | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hosmer, Joe Lloyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wallace, William Harper | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Tamara | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tidwell, Trever Loyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, Sherry Y. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCall, Boria | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Snow, Euil Everett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rutledge, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gowdy, Dan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, Howard Harrison | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williamson, James L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winter, Glyn E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hampton, Johnnie L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Teele, Cois Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Jack Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, William Lee Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shear, Horace Gene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Craig, Lloyd Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bunch, Mose Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Charles Gregory | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Murray, Lonnie G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Arthur Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boston, Carey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawson, Tommy Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rice, Tony | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payton, Jr., George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Woodrow | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Forbes, Willie Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kelley, Larry Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Myers, Shryl Lynn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Horton, Joe Roger | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maddox, Oddis Luther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCleney, William Truitt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perdue, Bennie Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Bernard Tilly | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Weldon, G. W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bennett, Velva | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kay, Evelyn Hannah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Warren, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gary, Jr., John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Bobby Gene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, James Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kelley, Mary Kathy Estes | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Claud Willis Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chapman, Jr., Nathan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lawrence, Clarence Jefferson S | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Edward Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hines, Robert Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Percy Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benson, Johnny James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCurdy, Joe Norman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Benny | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walding, Douglas Dennis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wigginton, Brice Basel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Frazier, Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Roger Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Means, Dozie Mae Card | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Matthews, Will | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hollie, Viola | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maiden, Larry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Grover Bradley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rutledge, Artis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Betty Ethel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Connie L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ashley, Will | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, S. H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mickel, James Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hannah, Alvin Homer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Freeman, Lois | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Raspberry, Charlie Daniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hinton, Henry Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perry, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barwick, James Harland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Underwood, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shepherd, John R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rhoades, Avis Derl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mann, Joe Curtis Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Dansy L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dillars, Bobbie S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crocker, Carolyn Louise Berga | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, James Phillip | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gamble, Sammie J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pinkard, Clarence E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Price, Shirley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fancher, Edward Vest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Sidney | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Price, Jr., Jesse | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dudley, Willie Moore | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cook, Arthur Kyle | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holcombe, Darrel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rickman, Forrest Bernard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baswell, Earl Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blackmon, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wade, Lee Nathaniel Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Melvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Giddens, Willie Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Douglas, Keith | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maston, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Newton, Melvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Godwin, Ben | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Samuel E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Porter, John Julius | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ridgel, Carolyn J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parsons, Avery E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shiver, Mitchell Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sims, Lloyd Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rutledge, Jasper Jack | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smitherman, Donald A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Evans, O'Lillian | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ellis, Ocea | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brownlow, Johnny Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pinkard, Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Layton, Billy Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reaves, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Osburn, Jr., Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Culwell, Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Evans, Olean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Estes, Olen Young | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pate, Lillian B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spratt, Lewis George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Russell, Marion Duane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Craig, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Faniel, Jo Ela | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carmichael, Longwell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Edward Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stokes, Walter F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fox, Otto Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cox, Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Childress, Junious Theodore | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, James Augustus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perry, Johnnie Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rayburn, Clarence H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anderson, Charles A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campbell, Oliver | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogan, Joyce | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Willie George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogan, Barry Allen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morris, Isaac Dewitte | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Levert, Walter T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, RICHARD | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Robert Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Huggins, Eddie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, Miles C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Porter, Clarence Edmond | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Milazzo, Sam Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McHoward, Ceasar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Steele, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Wilburn Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bailey, William Alfred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gowdy, Lisa | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rogers, Annie I. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burkett, Edward O'Neal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Camp, Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Ralph Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robison, William Clayton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walters, Daniel Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Luker | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Echols, Claude | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vann, Jesse James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Leonard, Jr., John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Regina Little | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henderson, Curlie C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fox, William Roy Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Redrick, Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harper, Edward O. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alexander, Lloyd Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hardy, Charles Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, William T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, Rose Mery Mines | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Commodore | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Eloise | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hardin, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payne, John Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Headley, Bennie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Charles Lynn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Abbott, Jr., Frelon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Love, Mitchell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
James, Milton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boykin, John H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ellison, Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Redricks, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Embry, Roland D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brooks, Roy Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Showers, Frances McConnell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Leonard, Jacqueline A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jenkins, Woodrow | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, William Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reach, James Austin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rush, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lambeth, Corrie D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilbanks, Euel Wilburn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilliam, Bobby | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benton, Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dibble, Marsha Denise Sandford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Ronald W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Trawick, Angelene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Levell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Windham, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMickens, Billy George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pittman, Dewey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bradley, Bernice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McDowell, McKinley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cox, Ralph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Norton, Jim Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pearson, Walter Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burns, Joseph Manley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
James, Jr., Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McEachern, IV, Dan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rodriguez, Franklin D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCray, Jr., William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Inell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spraggins, Sam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blackwell, Roscoe C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moorehead, Arnold Dee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Todd, Charles Dupree | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mines, Edith | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alexander, Gary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Charles Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Muir, William L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Amison, Luther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Robert Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Dennis Ethan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Emma Nell Lavender | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Craig, R. Neely | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hood, Herman E. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bullock, Joe Donald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Hollie B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Gerald W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hooks, Emanuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Caldwell, Curtis Smith | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morrison, Donald R. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rogers, Jimmy Wright | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sims, Lillie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Douglas, Lynn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Merritt, Asa Hubert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Farley, Jr., Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bolden, William Benjamin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burke, U. L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, Larry Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thornton, Harry Preston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Greene, William Wesley Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winston, Jewell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, Russell B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Levert, Johnnie Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Templin, Pierce T. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Young, Harvey Gray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jenkins, Dewey Rudolph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spand, Freddie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crosier, Frank Agee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whitley, Rosie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ward, Walter Royal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lindsay, James Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pleasant, Kermit R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamilton, Wilbro | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winter, Vivian F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lumpkin, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Alfred Washington | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Galloway, Wayne Towe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campbell, Neil Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stafford, Charlotte C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, Jack Reid | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, David Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kennedy, Robert William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Neely, Donna Jo Segars | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Webb, Clarence C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hodges, Steele W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cogman, Willie J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Arterberry, David N. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Champion, Marvin Phynoy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Denson, Bennie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roberts, Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Price, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Donald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dulin, Louis Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mosley, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Lilton Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scarbrough, Wilbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reese, George Ellis Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lesure, William Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ward, LEROY | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Towns, J. D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Amos, Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, John D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMorris, Charlie Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rucker, Frank R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drew, William Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anderson, Walter Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Eason, Webster | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vaughn, Thomas H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Johnnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Owens, Wilby | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, Johnnie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, Katie B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Little, Carol | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Clifford Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Mary Ruth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herbinger, William Echols Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Matthews, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morris, Jr., Leslie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Kenneth R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wiley, Elmer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tate, J. T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Jr., Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Cephas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Hubbard Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chamblin, Willie Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Jr., Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gordon, Ben Edward Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hayes, Adolph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wells, Eldridge Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Marshall | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hatcher, Edward Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, Mose | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Osburn, Eddie Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ward, Elmus Perry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dunning, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Doss, William Alden | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cody, Thomas Elmer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Alex | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walton, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Carroll D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gary, Margella | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Berry, Henry Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knox, Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moffett, Robert Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chatta, Chris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, Margie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Brenda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howell, James Leverston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maddox, Will Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whiten, Edgar Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barger, J. T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crane, George Kenneth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Muncher, Belinda Lee Nichols | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Louise N. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herron, Willie Lee Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hameen, Ezekiel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fields, Hessie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winston, Louis Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Levert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mason, Clittie L.N. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spraggins, William H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holloway, William Gordon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vick, Laverne Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Newton, Michael | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bottomlee, Rodney Renay | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Shirley Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Monday, Ervin W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Jr., Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, Gloria J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, David Mitchell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
DeLoach, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Charles Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Percy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Jake | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Starks, Isom | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, William Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blount, Major | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hadder, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mauk, Claude Hughlon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Foltz, Everette W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Bob | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henderson, Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wallace, Thomas Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tate, Barbara Jean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Lottie Arrick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Snow, Jacquelyn M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bennett, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, Silas Monroe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Albert, William Bennett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chaney, Mildred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, Robert L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Gustofe T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tutt, Jr., James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rector, John Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Birchem, Jesse D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thigpen, William Lucious | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hopkins, Clayborne William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mosley, John Ellis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Earnest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Arrick, Willie Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, James Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hunter, William Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tew, Richie Bruce | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Henry Perryman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Abernathy, Cecil Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crawford, Janis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nichols, Otha Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Copeland, Donna Gail Rawson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reagan, James David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moten, Nathaniel Hawthorne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winter, John Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Postell, Robbie Faye | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Card, Rosalind Marie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hornbuckle, Preston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stansberry, Earl Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Suzanne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Johnnie Booker | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Johnny | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boykin, Charlie Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kendrick, Alvin Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Felix Jones Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lipscomb, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, Bobby Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parks, Elijah Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ray, Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Herman Alfred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Russell, Raymond Carroll | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Singleton, J. R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Eddie Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lynn, Emmett G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
NICHOLS, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Isabell S. Cook | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bush, Kenneth R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wells, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Ross | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beard, Ronald William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bates, Houston Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bracknell, Daniel Houston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Altha | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brodie, William Stewart | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClellan, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Carolyn Jean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Haynes, James Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hale, Edna | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, James Elbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Andrews, James C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Washington, Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davidson, Addie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Alfonzo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Jr., John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thrash, James P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Foster, LaJessie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Charles Allen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Willis, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chatta, Pauline A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tidwell, Tony P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bennett, Jack Monroe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fitts, Jimmy Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coggins, Thurman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roberson, Simmie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Braaswell, Philip Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tremor, Patricia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Agee, Theo Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dunnican, James Bell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drake, James F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shaw, Letson Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Willie George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McGough, Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shipman, Theo Powell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stewart, Andrew Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boone, Minnie R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crim, Hubert L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Easter, Erma Gallups | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tew, Julie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Toney | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, James Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Stephen Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woods, Edna | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Keith, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pinkard, Annie L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crisler, James Lawrence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, JOHN WESLEY | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kennard, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gragg, William Stewart | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ball, Jerry W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henton, Durrand | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Gena | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Arcola | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Long, David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
James, Cleveland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Ruby Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Freddy Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benson, Cornelius | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Averell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thunderburg, Sandra | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cooper, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hilleary, Fred Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beaty, Thomas Claud | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Jr., Clyde | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Corbett, Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Templin, Harold D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Young, Robert Edward Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lavender, Virginia B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glenn, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boutwell, Robert Augustus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Burl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stafford, William Charles Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alfano, Frank Paul | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gamble, Alex Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wynn, Buck | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morris, Major Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
O'Dazier, Henry Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winston, Crystal A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ridley, Robert James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogue, Henry Dewayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Jr., Jesse | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wine, James Hoytt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fuller, Samuel Woodrow | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Graham, Daniel K. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Catherine C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Keith, Edward Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Griffin, Tom Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rankin, David Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, Minnie Jean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harper, Veann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Roderick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, George R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waller, Coleman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drummond, Ethan W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Antonio, Anthony Paul | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, Billy Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Jerome | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Malone, Lorenza | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tarver, Dave | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burks, Jacqueline | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Ronnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Daniels, Theodis Harrison | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Andrew Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moorer, Alfred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morrow, Jr., James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nance, Oscar R. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, William Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Griffith, Clarence M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Arendale, Bonita Sharon Kay | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McGee, Bonzell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Colvin, Earnest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Click, Jerry Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davall, Mara Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, James Russell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sweeting, James Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Willis, Horace | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henderson, Willie Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Wilbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCray, Bernard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vinson, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nichols, John Mark Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mahaffey, Troy James Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Day, Henry Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rush, Eddie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Larry, George Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Montgomery, Beverly | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Acoff, Joe Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goggins, Luther Dainer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reynolds, James C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Yolette A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dabbs, Maurice Powell Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smoot, John Matthew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
O'Neal, Lawrence Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Otis Holmes | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Devine, Robert L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burks, Ernest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, Bernard J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Willie Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woods, Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Thomas James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Minard, Bob | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lindsey, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rancher, Joe Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tate, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burch, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lofton, Herbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scarbrough, Frederick Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jordan, Thomas Ed | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Caldwell, Bobby Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Willis, Johnnie Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hannon, Richard Elvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carlock, Robert Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Zester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, Butler Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, John Wesley Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMickens, William Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alexander, Herman Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dial, Sheila Denise Smith | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Jr., Gennie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Jr., Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Lucille | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coates, John Burkley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Forrest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, John Ernest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, J. B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Warren James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Duncan, Amos | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tyler, Jr., Luther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tipton, James Wallace | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Little, Jessie James Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barksdale, Jr., Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Marshel Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ashcraft, Gladys O. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ross, Delmer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dixon, Cleve | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Ernest Sr | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lavender, Reginald Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Frison, James Eldridge | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Vanessa | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCloud, Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Freeman, James Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dodd, William Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pearson, Belinda A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Willie James Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winston, Charlie Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawson, Brenda Gail | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, Jr., Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Guthrie, Darelene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Writesman, Donald C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bearden, Lowell Vandell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Ollie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allen, Coleman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vines, Margaret Perry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Exford, Alex | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kennedy, Alray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lawrence, Clarence Jefferson J | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Robert A. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Long, Benjamin Samuel Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Reginald N. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sartain, John R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spencer, James Daniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kennedy, James Lester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crockett, Omie R. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, W. C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, Thomas M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Key, Johnny Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bolden, Roderick L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Annie C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goree, Henry Leo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Avery, Cecil Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garnett, Maudie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilder, Preston L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harrison, Phillip D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mims, Jr., Percy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tubbs, Horace R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stinson, Henton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McGhee, Jr., Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kirksey, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carden, Raymond R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jefferson, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Frank Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Buckner, Doyle Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crutchfield, Milton Terry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bouyer, Earnest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McGinnis, Willie Lee Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vann, Robert Survilla | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilliam, Miloy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McKnight, Arthur Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, Eda Bell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Catsban, Harry Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Craid, Ernest C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goldsby, Earnestine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Luster, Jr., Aaron | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dalton, Willie James Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brasfield, Harold Norman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mauldin, William Cavey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Jessie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stone, Aurbon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barnes, Thomas Pruitt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blackwell, William Oscar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bizzell, Willie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
HUDSON, SCOTT | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Abbott, John Truman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Otis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, Leonard Otis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brasher, Ray Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lavender, Curtis Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goff, Leonard Luther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Austin, Jr., John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bush, Richard Barry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benison, Jimmie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sexton, Sandy Ted | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Armstrong, Milton Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gordon, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Farries, Alonzo Lonnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jenkins, Billy Garrett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cranford, Jerry Norman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knight, Herman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watson, Walter Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Larson, Willis Gene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClendon, E. D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holyfield, Timothy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taunton, Morris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Finch, Ronald Graves | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sumpter, John Collin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Therman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Richardson, Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Giles, John Colvert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Woodrow Buster | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, Carter C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, James Edward Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cox, ONeal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Ralph W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilder, Robert Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maiden, Percy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Marlin Monroe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Jr., Ezekiel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Breedlove, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dozier, Jr., Leslie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, Winfred Noah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morrow, Alexander | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baxter, Percy James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mulkin, Lewis Gordon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wallace, Bettye J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Donald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Henry B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Landreth, Charles Henry Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pugh, Lila Mae McAuley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hosey, John Reid | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spivey, Charles B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Grant, Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Guin, Charles Lafayette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Larry C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roland, Mary Ella | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Billy Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamilton, Ruby Jean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moten, Howard Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, L. C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Henry Lane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Myers, Jimmy Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McIntyre, Leon V. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reynolds, Dan James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fields, James Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Louis James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Paulette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Handley, Luke | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goodwin, Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
DeFranco, Peter J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fields, Kathlene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brady, Claude Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Calvert, Jr., Leonard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spidle, William Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hawkins, Robert Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vines, Janie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sykes, Henry Colyer Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Golden, Julia Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glenn, Robin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kuzmicki, Webb L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Anitrus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Elliott, Jack Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Golden, James Lowell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Teer, Preston Cook | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Nevada | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Newton, Jr., Melvin B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carrington, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Trigg, George Erba | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
English, Robert W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lane, Leonard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lucas, Otis Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, Earl Green | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Epting, Paul H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crim, Sonjya L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Duncan, Ralph Isaac | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Higdon, John L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payne, Charles William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mason, Christy Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maniece, Morris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Booth, James Hamilton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rice, Daryl V. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bailey, Verlon L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pope, Darlene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, James Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Samuel Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
SMITH, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sheffield, Connie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Will Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benion, Deborah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, John Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winslett, Sam Stephenson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McIlwain, Raphael | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, George Clayton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Files, Ruben | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Medley, Charles William Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Willis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, Jr., James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burney, Clifton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fennell, Tia-Juannia H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Grimes, Ernest O. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Evans, Armogene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Arthur Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ephriam, Romey B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spencer, William G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Calvin R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maye, Bettye L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Speed, Eugene Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Greening, Morris Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garrett, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Newton, Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Dock | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waldrup, Dorothy Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Louis Andino | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pruitt, Elbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smitherman, Moses L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gipson, James P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spencer, Otis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Camp, Raymond A. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Horace Dean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goodwin, Shemeika R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Leonard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Champion, Hayes | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barnes, Louis Ford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilford, Ollie L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mason, John Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bellamy, Charles C. King | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rox, Eddie Bernard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rush, Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Zinnerman, Percy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCrorie, Harry Clark | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hunnicutt, James Duffey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Foltz, Winhelmina Margaret | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Floyd Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, NATHANIEL | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bearden, James R. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Lawrence Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, Jr., Porter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hollie, Julia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rice, Willie John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bedell, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Irby, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burkes, Charles Jackson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Noe, Evelyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Mamie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Falls, Carl Ralph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Monroe, Diane F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Evans, William Clifton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Malone, Otis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMickens, Jessie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stoudmire, James Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rylant, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carnes, Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, Isaac | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glass, Hermie Carl Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Preliou, Ilona James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Booker T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rape, Clarence Kizer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Weaver, Theodore C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Alonzo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Adams, Carolyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campbell, Cecil Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McGill, Willie Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Powell, William H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tate, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hall, John Hoyt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Felder, Jr., Otto | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whitfield, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McAphee, Sylvester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Glenda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Amason, James Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bowers, Dacil Legard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hendon, Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cunningham, Wallace | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allen, Willie Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peoples, Roy L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bolden, Jr., Wheeler | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Sylvester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Austin, JAMES | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Capps, Walter R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ganus, Jimmy O. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sizemore, Thomas Leslie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Leady Gant | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roper, Willie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, Gwendolyn W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Daniel, Isiah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Todd, Edward Coolidge | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bradley, Benjamin Clyde | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stinson, James F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baugh, James R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Ralph Erskine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perry, Jr., Ernest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barnhill, Sharon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ridgel, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Abron, Sonja Arrick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Doyle, R. J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Satisfield, Fletcher | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, E. Faye Pugh | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gatson, Alga | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sharp, Diane Pickens | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rainey, John Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCrorie, Richard Timothy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Aquinetta Leshawn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tyler, Roy S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Canupp, Kathryn Craig Summers | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herrod, Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Jr., Hillard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, Lonnie Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walton, Clara | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burrow, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Benjamin F. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dennis, Romanious | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Jr., Nathan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Billy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Rayford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, John K. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barksdale, Latrice Hollie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hardy, Lawrence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Early, Claude | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woods, Martha | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Douglas, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kent, L. S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Otto O. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nance, Alice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Snow, Imag3ene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davidson, Jr., Abel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cruce, Robert Clifton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dobbins, Jr., Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Steward, Glenda Gaill | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Lester T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harrington, Herbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pugh, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hocutt, James Harvey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Manning, Charles Arnold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Embry, Paul Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Oliver, James Troy Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sfakianos, Nick Constantine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McQuenn, Linda Stephens | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cardwell, Larry P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Staples, Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harper, Monroe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nesmith, Hazel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Willie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Julia Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blevins, Elaine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vines, Carl Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Russell, Willie C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Freddie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rice, Devonia Lynell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Willie Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davidson, Adolph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bennett, Clyde Percy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ballard, Willie Elton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, John Hart | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hall, Horace Esker | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Richardson, Alex | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ward, Patrick James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hunter, Shirley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carrington, Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Browning, William Lawrence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hayes, Roland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miles, Joe Daniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pope, Cleveland Bell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Marvin Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hawkins, John Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pitts, Ernest Eric | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, Oscar K. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Minnie Grace | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Evelyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Powell, Glenda Diane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McConnico, David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hairston, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Dan W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whitlow, Delbert Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rogers, Debra Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Ida M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Underwood, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Guy, Odess | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pugh, Freddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, Oliver Hiram | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peoples, Dorothy Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Powe, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herring, Sam M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mason, Julian Dale | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spraggins, Vivian M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hunter, Criss | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anderson, Melton Beamon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Clifford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Frederick, William Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lomax, George Washington | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hasberry, Alexander | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morgan, Herndon Neil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Motes, Benjamin B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Troy Alvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kendrick, William H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, James Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dudley, Fayette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Overton, James P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, Annie B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Frank R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, James Kent | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Jacob | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chamberlain, George Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henton, Darrell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carmichael, Abbie S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ingram, Johnnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bates, John Wesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Harrison Benjamin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hinton, Ravon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Deed, Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shipp, Franklin Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pendleton, Danielle James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McKinstry, Luther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ford, Ray Martin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nixon, Percy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Middleton, Jackie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Daniel, Charlie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Abbott, Geraldine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Poole, James Monroe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payne, Delton Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Biddles, Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bates, Ozell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, Tom | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Anthony Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nichols, Judith Marie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilmore, Ronald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crawford, Adell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knight, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cost, Stanley Willard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shoults, Howard Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Jesse | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gibbs, John W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shotts, Lambert Reuben | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wallin, Joseph Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barber, Robert Milton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Gordon Crawford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Strother, Elijah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Exford, Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Jr., William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Duncan, Russell Collins | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waldrop, Earl R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cooley, Dan S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Salter, Phillip Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Batton, Terry Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Gerald Dorian | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Owens, Perry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bridges, Jr., James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Evergreen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shade, Samuel R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roy, William Shelton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Johnnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Dan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hall, Wilson Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Braxton, Alvester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Multrie, Cleveland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allan, Samuel David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Arthur Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hendrix, Capus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maddox, Thomas Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Oglesby, Jimmy Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pinkard, Nathan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Jeanette Marie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cipriani, Ellen R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fason, Ted Elaine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morgan, James Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Clarence L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carmichael, Reuben F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hendrix, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kelley, Donald Clay | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Byrd, James Bernard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, James Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benson, Clarence S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Jessie Green | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baker, Johnny A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ridgel, Mary K. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Speight, Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Adams, Henry Lamar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watkins, Elizabeth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ware, Lillie Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McGowan, Paul Benny Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mardis, Linda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bandy, Jr., Harvey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herron, William Ellis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gamble, Wilma P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, William T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goodgame, Henry Melvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bridier, Helen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dandridge, London England Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Candice M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Skates, Larry Curt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Armstead, Ellis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hatcher, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Lewis M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Lot | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Matthews, Sam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Capps, Ivan Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Windham, Darrow Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, A. King | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spencer, Carolyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reed, Paul Allen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tyler, Betty Jo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chappell, Carl E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fields, Jr., Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reeves, Jr., Willie Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roberts, William Allen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, John Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilmore, William Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baskerville, Lola W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Skelton, Donald C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Foster, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Murdock, Walter Clifford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Milton, Jr., Lemuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nolan, Arthur Deward Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Loveless, Herman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Theo Van | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Sandra F. Dudley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Craig, Ernest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Paul, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payne, Clayton Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Allen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Wallace | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilmore, James Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Praytor, J. L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Layne, Robert Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lyons, James Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rainey, Mary Monique | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fluker, Samuel Raymond | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Little, Ronald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spain, Cleon Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fox, Evan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jett, Norman Aaron | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cox, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Will Murray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Marlow, Charles Herman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allen, Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patmon, James William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hyatt, James Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Dorothy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Templin, Max Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Sadie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crum, Grady | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Swagart, Dorothy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brake, James Randall | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, George Washington | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pearson, Billy Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Annie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nichols, James Rolland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rice, Jr., Johnnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, S. L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, James Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stewart, Deborah W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wrench, Jr., Benny | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Borden, Wilfred Leslie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glass, Dewey Virgil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, Willies | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hare, Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moten, Willie Dan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cunningham, Alvin Luther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campbell, John L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Fred Leonard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dennis, Albert Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woodruff, Leon S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Agee, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bowman, Walter Mansell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Grady, Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Postell, Tommy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garner, Edgar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reeves, Maurice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kulp, Frank Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maye, Leroy Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pindale, Shirley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brady, William Mark | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Price, TOM | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mabee, Crawford Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Leverett, Roy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClinton, Warner B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Marlene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reese, Matthew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Snead, Jasmine D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payton, Walter Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benion, Irene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Charles Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hall, Carter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Jr., Cornelius | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crenshaw, Ed | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, George W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stevenson, Bernice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hare, Norman Miller | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stephens, Elizabeth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rutledge, Ura D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rox, William Henry Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lawrence, Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stokes, Jerry Lamar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Logan, Floyd Hutto | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gunn, Ollie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Worford, Luke | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morgan, Earnestine Stevenson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, Clifton N. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harper, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Terry, Timothy Lester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Willis, William Martin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hudson, Stacy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Godbolt, Arthur Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Little, Eunice J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baird, Haley Cavender | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robertson, Robert L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sims, George Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Henry Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, Jr., Namon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Paul, Larry Davis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Merrymon, Jack Ervin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Owens, Jr., Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stinson, Jr., Tom | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dudley, Debbie R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Letson, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Showers, Ernest Ivory | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Contorno, Joseph Peter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sellers, William Howell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Adams, Virgil Benson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamilton, Evelyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hollie, Jurez | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Weston, James L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holmes, Clyde Wendell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ferguson, Roger Johnson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Caldwell, Henry Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Steward, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Luther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campbell, George Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maynard, Warren Gene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Alcorn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cobb, Sharon Denise Nichols | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roland, Albert C. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tolbert, Glenda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rush, Marvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, Austin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nesmith, Rodger D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Studmire, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Kenneth Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anderson, Earnest Guy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Youngblood, Tom | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Freeman, James E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Borden, William Hale | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burchfield, Dewey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carroll, Dowell H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Jr., Tommy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Captain, Joseph E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Rose | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Evans, Willie Bea | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Worford, Clifton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kelley, Thomas Molton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Josephus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Regulus, Adolphus Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rayford, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCray, Elijah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garrett, Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cowan, John L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Noah, James Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, James Woodrow | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, James B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
James, Jr., Jesse | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, Mittency | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stokes, Horace Roland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Louis Monroe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Elbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Simon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ethridge, James Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Berga, Donald Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Helen Cole | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mason, Jr., Dave | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bailey, Mexico | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Rufus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shelby, Tommy Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Jr., Lloyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Rubin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Jr., George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Battle, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hayes, Office | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Calvert, Aubrey Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bogan, Ben | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pope, Moses Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Skinner, Billy Jack | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fewell, Brice Olen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barnes, Willis Monroe Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Jordan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woodall, Mary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dupont, Wilbert Odell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mickles, Ralph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cox, Sidney | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Washington, Shelia S. Stephens | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Myree, Harold Augusta | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Butts, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hand, Benny E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogan, Dwight Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hayes, Pink | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Towles, Earline | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Salter, James Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Myers, Frank Eskel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wakefield, Charles W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thornhill, Hobart B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tracy, William Harry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hembree, Andrew Byron | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rodriguez, Mildred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCrary, Elton D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Willis, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, Jeff D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tyson, Melvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fondren, Fred D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wooten, Annie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Syx, Edwin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Braswell, Timothy Alan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pickett, Jr., Major | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harp, William Marion Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pitts, Tommy Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, Sandra | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Jr., Jesse | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Patrick L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, Joseph E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cobb, Joe Baltzell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vines, Alice Patton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
WALKER, David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cliett, Robert Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Austin, A. G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morris, Grace Helen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kelley, William Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vest, Clayton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCrary, Dennis Edwards | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Booker, Harvey Kendrick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Meacham, Cecil Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Camp, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Willie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kimbrel, James Blumer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Witherspoon, Warren | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hays, Dale Lafayette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lashley, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hardy, Carol E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ganus, Donald L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lumpkin, Earnest James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holston, Chauncey Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Etta | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Nelson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boykins, George Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Levins, Lawrence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Emily Jean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Helen Patricia Hardy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glass, John Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perry, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wimbush, Willie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blocker, Monroe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shorter, Pamela D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McIntosh, Jerry N. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brewer, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bailey, Marion Elwood | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Todd, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bowen, Marshall McKinley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, William O. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Savage, Preston Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roland, Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stringfellow, Kenneth A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fisher, Jr., Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tyler, Richard H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barksdale, Pauline S. Henderso | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nolen, Louis Columbus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, Ernest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Harold Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Salter, J. B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Killian, Roland David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pickett, Walter Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burger, James Everett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Byrd, Jimmy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Abrams, Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bradford, Erskrayden | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tew, Massey Dawes | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bates, Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, Henry A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCulley, Henry V. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Dorothy T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campbell, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cooper, James Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bennett, Lonnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pittmon, Arteris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howell, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Roosevelt Franklin Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Leonard Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reed, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Carl E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Broome, Hayes Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carroll, Jerry Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Palmore, John T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campisi, Anthony | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anderson, Rayndol | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barnes, John Isaac | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McManus, Charles Chester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fowlkes, Alonzo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perdue, Tommy J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilmore, Kristi | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woods, Danny Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Webster, Jr., Cleveland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knighten, Earnest Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Willis, Motell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harrison, Thomas J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Belew, Clarence Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Huey, Claud Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sokira, Frank C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allen, Jr., Ben | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Butts, Grover Cleveland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Neil Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Yarbrough, Thomas E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kerley, Frank Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
COLE, GENERAL LEE | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ross, Booker T. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Milican, Robert Sylvester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Archie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Michael Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harbin, Jr., Dewey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Freddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Mary E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Camp, Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benford, William Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Jr., Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Little, Dewitt Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Buttram, Gerald Griffin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Long, Carl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Todd, Austin Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, William Henry Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gibbs, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cain, Troy Ronnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Bailey G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Childers, Robert L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anderton, Edna S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Matthews, Collier Junior | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dixon, Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tolbert, Thomas James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bennett, Malcolm Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chesnut, Peggy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, William Clarence Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Levern | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lowery, Woodie Ray Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, James E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anderson, Melvin Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Massengale, Joseph William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ellis, Cynthia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Jessie Royall | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gardiner, Harold Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Jerry Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Carl Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gladness, Lula M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Jr., James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lindsey, Jr., John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clardy, Bobby Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rudolph, Wylie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bosha, Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Jesse Alexander | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCann, Jack T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alford, James Cecil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Daw, Lee Hagood | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hale, Jerry Dean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kennedy, Morris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, Jr., Tom | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Murner, Charlie Max | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spradlin, Willis T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spencer, Ceolyar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilborn, Valencia Y. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cathey, James Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jerigan, Isiah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, Zion | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Null, Rachel Johnson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drake, Clyde | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Albert E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Askew, John Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Altes, Charles Roy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nesmith, William N. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, III, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hayes, Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vice, William Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wing, Otis Norwood | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bozeman, Charles Earley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, DeaTricia Michelle | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Craid, Ray A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bowden, Jr., Milton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, James Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hobson, Thurman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Simmons, James Leonard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Corretti, Johnnie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lamar, Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lambert, Lidge Steve | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cook, James Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hawkins, Gus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCrorie, Harry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morrow, Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, John Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gardner, Martin Z. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
YOUNG, Christine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Steven Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilore, Frances S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ridgel, Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reach, Willard Hewlett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Law, Booker Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Virginia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Weldon, Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Evans, Odie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hudson, Jordan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whitlow, Benjamin Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Jr., Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Milton, Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Simmons, William Guy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beacher, Fletcher | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Linford Bernard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Grady, Julius F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kallaher, William Patrick Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Abernathy, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Archie, Johnnie William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ashcraft, Jimmy Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
ARMSTRONG, JOHN | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hampton, Isora Rene Starks | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
James, Chester Morris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Denton, Jerry Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Darby, John Wesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nichols, Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Webster, Joshua | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Joiner, James H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hines, Voncile | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sorrell, Thomas Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Norman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bowden, William Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, Jr., Christian | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sundberg, Ernest Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
DeJarnett, Zachariah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Avant, Wilma Y. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Paul L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lambert, Vernon Collin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wooley, Roy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brodie, Robert W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spraggins, Daniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Pearlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mines, Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fikes, Vanessa | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Grace S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Louie Oliver | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Johnnie Milton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Mittie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bivens, Otto Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bishop, Andrew J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Nelson W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spencer, CHARLES | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Widener, Raymond Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hammonds, Lewis Turner | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Freddie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peterson, Lula | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winter, Christine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Margaret Jean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tolbert, Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hooper, Tyler | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winter, Nell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waller, Walter Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Douglas, David E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Jessie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, James Robert Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campbell, Donna Sue Miller | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Bennie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bridges, Earl W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Willie C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Murphy, Jr., Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shaw, Ollis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
James, Leonard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Edwards, Wesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robertson, Jessie Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Nathan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Andrews, Naamon Martin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Steward, Shirley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McConnico, Sam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payne, William Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mines, Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waller, Milton Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Willie Oliver | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Simmons, Mary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cobb, Fred Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
ANDERSON, LOIS | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harrison, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dinkins, Charles Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Landerfelt, John Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pearson, Thomas Jefferson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Avella B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Joseph Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Graham, Millard Daniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ford, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whitfield, Tarten Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hudson, Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Muhammad, Dionne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dansby, Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fox, Otto Leroy Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Lamar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Aycock, Clyde C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Henry Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patton, Earnest Howell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
LaRussa, Anthony J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knight, Alicia Rechelle | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Edward Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, BENJAMIN | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rice, Johnnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baswell, Johnny Horace | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Tommie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Crosby | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Haynes, Charles P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Otis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Malone, Senequa M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ratliff, Paul D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Postell, Tammie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drake, Melvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burchfield, Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lockhart, Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shepherd, Fred Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Snead, Katie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crossley, Edgar M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wages, Jerry Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Witherspoon, Randolph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kelley, ROBERT | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCormick, Jr., Duncan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pettway, Jr., Mark | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Jr., Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hudson, Joshua | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Norris, Lillian | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Jr., Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Ivory | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Prestley, Roy Melvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Napolean Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Richardson, Valerie Jean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lacey, James C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cobern, Marvin C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, Robert A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moody, Minnie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Betty Shiver | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Alvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tate, Jim | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Craig, Kathryn Neely | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Salter, Dempsey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McArthur, Edward William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Freeman, Lucious | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McLin, Willie H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Woodrow Wilson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
East, Linwood Guy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
WILLIAMS, JOHN L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shelton, Eugene Cole | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hall, Jr., Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Foreman, Jr., Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ireland, Ted L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Dudley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Surrett, Alton Sidney | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMickens, John Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sperling, Elaine S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henton, Gregory | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, George Washington | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coates, Roosevelt Pettigrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lovett, George Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fowler, Tommy A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roper, John William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, Claude | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morton, William Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Childress, Benjamin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henton, Erick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Witt, Alex | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henderson, Jimmy Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herring, William Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beasley, Jessie R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Arrington, Steve Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Contorno, Rosanna | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Atkins, Esther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crow, Mildred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beard, Larry Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Leshoure, Luellen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shearer, Martin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boyd, Clarence McDaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nesmith, Jeffrey A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scarbrough, Jr., Wilbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hyde, Jr., Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McNair, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Epperson, Dorris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Wallace Erskine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blake, Clay Burnum | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, Darryl Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bruce, Henry Burt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Malone, Demetrius | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spraggins, William H. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, Lewis Clinton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chambers, William Lester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clay, Clemmon Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watkins, Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Dorothy Williams | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Earlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crawford, Cynthia E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Emmons, Blanton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Braswell, Wade Haden | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williamson, Brenda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Fred Russell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wells, Arvis D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waldrop, Paul Grover | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Percy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pilkerton, Aubrey F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hall, Jerry Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawson, Laverne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Johnny Frank Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kelley, Alton Clay | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Law, Lawrence Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Foltz, Ronald Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blackmon, George Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Butler, Joseph Felix | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gildersleeve, Etta Pearl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wynn, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roper, Cathy Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCurdy, Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gibbs, Juan Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, James Ausborn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, Donald Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carneghy, Anessa | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mikell, Jessie Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maiden, Carlos | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Salter, Jack Dewey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winter, Robert Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Page, Tom | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Horsley, Gerald Mitchell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hardy, Ronald Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harkins, Sammy W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Albert James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chapman, Sherman Shepard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, Jerry Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reese, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Martha Sue | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baldwin, Ozene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
SANDERS, Larry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Steager, Cledas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, James W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watts, Willie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harrison, Herbert Samuel Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drummond, Casey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barrett, Rogers C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wabbington, Edd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walton, James Francis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Callahan, Charles E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blackwell, Kirby C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Jr., Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Sylvia V. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Lonnie Bernie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hall, Jessie Jerome | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Douglas, Jr., Floyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Roy Anthony | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crumpton, Oscar David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Calloway, Artis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fulford, Oliver | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vincent, William Ovid | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Jr., Johnny | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Devine, Noel D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fomby, Willie Lorenza | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
LaGroue, Edwin D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cole, Billy Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Counce, Kathryn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, Jr., Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lagle, Donald Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Donaldson, Lawson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Oydis E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williamson, Willie Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Yarbrough, William H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Capps, Donald Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilbur, Melvadean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Mary Jean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Essie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Bracy Ellice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Deborah Nell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reese, George E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Jan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hathcock, Robert R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Jr., Ham | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garner, Earnest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Resso, Melvin G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goode, Isaac Wilbur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Findley, Douglas W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Arterberry, Oweader | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pollard, William Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ingram, Albert B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chambers, Jr., Roy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goodwin, Joe H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Johnnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Canada, Joseph Gordon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mabry, Jr., Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burrell, Vincent | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Threlkeld, Bobby B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jessen, Harold Alfred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waine, Thomas Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, John Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Oakes, Daniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Farmer, Harris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Freeman, Frederick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Freeman, Luther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hollis, William R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nesbitt, Lehman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, James Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ogles, Arthur P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Sam Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henton, III, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ward, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Louise O. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mullins, Bertie Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kiker, James Hugh | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Clyde | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Judkins, Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harrelson, Harold W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, John Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, James Curtis Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cunningham, Earlie Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Posey, Odes Augusta | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Amison, Jr., Jim | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Henrietta U. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jenkins, Jr., Sam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Weaver, Thomas Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Warren, Robert Ernest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Clint | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baldwin, Brown | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nix, Carl Ellsworth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Steele, Jr., Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Greenlee, Fred Cason | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Donald Allen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crumpton, Audis Noah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hopper, Clifton Guy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brand, Joyce | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vines, Edna Staggs | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morrison, Roy Glenn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reno, Sterling | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Claude R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Porter, Deborah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
May, Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harmon, David Hugh | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moody, Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ray, Floyd Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Logan, James Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Olive, Gene Hubert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Hardy Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moorer, S. B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McGowan, Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Postell, John Dee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tate, Sandy F. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crowe, J. D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Granger, Henry S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blevins, Melvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lowery, Thomas H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Newton, Alfonso | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lindsey, Demetrius | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lavender, Willie Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Landrum, Tyro N. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harrison, Beulah C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chaney, Harold Devirn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, William Arthur Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bates, Johnnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
NEWTON, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
DeMotte, Bobby Neil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Belle, William C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMillian, Robert Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, Evelyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jaynes, Louis Winfield | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Marco | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Branch, Jr., Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beauchamp, Hal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Law, Willie Saul | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whisonant, Johnny V. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holland, Edward Lenville | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Jr., Johnny | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Ernest Clyde | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McGhee, Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beard, William Hoyt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ballenger, Oscar M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Butler, George Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fields, Sterling | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCarral, Sam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kidd, Roosevelt Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alexander, JOHN | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Argo, Harold Cecil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vernon, Lillie G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, William E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Augustus, John Thornton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reaves, Stanley Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knight, Shirley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stevenson, Robert Cleveland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Postell, Travis Oneal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Amos, Jerry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Upchurch, Sharon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bence, Albert Hoyt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Talley, Calvin Clifton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Key, Johnnie Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carroll, Daniel C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maiden, Ernest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ross, Thomas Warren | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Newton, Kelvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Oakes, Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Ronald Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gates, Sandra Faye | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hayes, Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ford, Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drummond, Shannon J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, James Bailey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holloway, Monroe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Green, Timmons J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burdette, Earl Herman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Vallie Pearl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Grover Lee Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Huggins, Jr., Percy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vines, James Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Marion Lawrence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hopkins, Billy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Schaefers, George Melvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shoemaker, Frank Bryan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gardiner, Robert M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nobles, Stephen P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Jim | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Foltz, Everette Waldo Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cooks, Robert Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stabile, Vincent Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clayton, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Johnny | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Albert B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scarbrough, Ernest James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Carolyn W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Millican, Archie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Abbott, Garry Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Russell, Thomas Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Simpson, Palmer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Steele, James Wesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harbin, David Bruce | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Amberson, James Wilson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Duncan, Estelle H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Earnest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
England, Willie Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Giles, Mary D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sandford, Johnny Allen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chatta, Joanne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Small, Frank D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Willie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roper, Frank Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cole, James Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peoples, Phillip | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pickett, Johnny | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chandler, Roy Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barnett, Jack Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Harold J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holloway, Jr., Monroe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Myles, Lee Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wells, Sandra | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woods, Shirley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harmon, James Benton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Curren, Jerome | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Purcell, Clayburn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Fred Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thedford, Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holt, Claude Adrian | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Logan, Jack Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Leonard, Edith | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stewart, John Vivian | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lomas, Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, Edward Gardner | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamm, Herbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Warren, Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Elliott, Eugene Dean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Jr., Calvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gibbs, Jr., Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kelley, William O. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Houston Oliver | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogeland, Larry J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hart, Lewis James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hyche, Theodore | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, Samuel Thomas Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brake, William Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Jr., Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baker, Pamela L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ragland, Douglas Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beavers, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
James, Mamie L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, Willie W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lovelace, Sherman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peoples, James Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pugh, Allen Suggs | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMeans, J. C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, Gloria | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Junious | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ross, Lewis Milton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spraggins, Frederick D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Rufus F. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nunn, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Curry, Willie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carney, Ham Patterson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clayton, Jr., Tom | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harrell, Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Jr., Archie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stephens, Jr., Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knott, Harry Rhett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beaird, Thomas Monroe Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Ra-Mon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Carl James Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rivers, Calvin Hudson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, James A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, James Alven | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harper, Tommie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shivers, Hugh Eben | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, James William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shiflett, Thurston Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Bennie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cook, Arthur Norvelle | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gentry, Lloyd Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hall, Ray Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Fred Marshall | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Marjorie Renee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Clemon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Samuel Rence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Malone, Vincent | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Terry, Jessie B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tubbs, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Calhoun, Willard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hunter, John Loren | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walden, James Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawson, Jr., Sylvester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, Percy Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dudley, Detreah Lamar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Owens, Chazita | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Avery, John Edward Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vines, David Lee Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crane, David Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wrenn, Peter James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bailey, Charlie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bush, Billie Jean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Herod Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Graham, Walter C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herron, Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Brenda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Robbie Neal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lucas, James Carter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stokes, James Alton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Motes, Thomas Wesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rowell, Emerick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, John Garrett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, Marcus O. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shaw, Martha | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Young, Cecil Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cole, Viola B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Evans, Earl Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Oakes, Marcus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sherman, Sam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Doris R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Jr., Sam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knox, Carl Phillips | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogue, Roland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClain, Herman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Leonard, Jr., Roy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garner, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Jr., Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McQueen, William Augustus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Jr., Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dattoli, Rocco J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
JOHNSON, JACK | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Marion L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Freeman, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Zinnerman, Willie James Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Grooms, Ernest Jefferson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lansford, John Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogue, Mamie Jane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Eric Darnell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bean, Robert Lee Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jayne, Arthur Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Austin, James Lennon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
DeVaughn, Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ridgel, Michael R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gosnell, Grady Jackson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hood, Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wood, Ray Rawdon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Melvis Charles Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Andrew Bruce | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Jr., Amos | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, William Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tinsley, Abron | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maize, Billy Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gatson, Ed Ocie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sims, Thearphilus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wells, Beulah Camp | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rush, Vera | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Poland, Thomas Herbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Radden, James Cecil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Dewayne Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perrigin, Sandra | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stevens, Cedric | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Young, Robert Linzie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drummond, George Shannon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Reddrick F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
DeLoach, Virgin M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Warren, Jr., Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, Lee Ernest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Phillip | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bloomingburg, H. Allan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Jimmie S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harbin, James P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carrington, Haughey H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Murphy, Terry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, James Winston Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pulliam, Benjamin Floyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Jr., George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Curren, Carl Wilburn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Mary Alice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Lorene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peeples, Willie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morgan, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benton, Charles Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hunt, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Edwards, McCarroll | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Evans, Roy J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Camp, Donald Denson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Betty Jo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Owen, Jimmie Morrow | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
DeLoach, Charles Edwards | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Sara Ida | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClusky, William W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCray, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knox, Elijah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nabors, Harvey Melton Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goodwin, Jessie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McIlwain, T'Sha | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Theodore R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Kenneth Oliver | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reach, Jerry Gilbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maulding, Grady | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drake, Anita | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Herbert Henry Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCay, Arvil D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brownson, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Helen D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herbinger, James Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Jr., Jack | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Capps, Jack Y. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dole, Louis J. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Avery, Charles David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Jessie P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, John B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Alexander | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
SCOTT, EARNEST | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fuller, Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bolden, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mims, Percy Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Rudolph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Higginbotham, Pete | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brooks, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jobe, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Grady L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dugger, Frank T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Judkins, Billy Ralph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Camp, Janice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Linda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hinkle, Henry Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burns, Samuel Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wrench, Ronald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Loggins, William Grady | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Montgomery, Henry Porter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rembert, Albert R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Files, Joe Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, John Dee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lenior, Angela Marie Plummer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knox, Lucille | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Jessie E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Braden, Paula | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Berga, Kenneth Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clayton, Jr., Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hoffman, Lester Allen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knapp, Ronald C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Grady, Robert L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hudson, Willie L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Persall, Robert Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reed, John Rucker | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Driskill, Jesse Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bandy, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Tyra Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Elbert Ellis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bearden, Edward Bert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moody, Thaddeus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hyde, Cornelius Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, Joseph Q. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Postell, Misty | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Driver, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Strong, James Gerald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ferguson, Oliver Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Creel, Edward Hamilton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mosley, Earl Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilkerson, Carroll | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Higdon, Loyce Durell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ross, Booker T. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gowdy, Levi | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fowler, Samuel Arliss | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, DAVID | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Petty, Freeman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allinder, Carl Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
CUNNINGHAM, JOHN C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Richey, Gerald Henderson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Charles O. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stewart, Timothy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crow, Glenis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pippens, Willie Claude | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beauchamp, Martha Nell Self | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McQueen, Woodrow | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burton, William Virgil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fleming, Hoyt James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walker, Lee C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fairchild, Earl Dock | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Forbes, L. T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Jr., William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barton, Richard Dennis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lloyd, Alva Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Bennie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Langley, Janice Ellen (Smith) | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Little, Ellis Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Powell, George C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McInish, Thomas Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Plummer, Edwin Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Amberson, James G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Irvin, Herman Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hinds, Austin Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Johnnie Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCloud, Valencia Herron | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Jr., Johnny | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alexander, Thomas Milton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beaton, Oscar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Gertrude F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, III, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lavender, Tommy James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMickens, Franklin Truman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Odiffie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Little, Robert Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knox, Joe Rise | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Norris, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rice, James Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bozman, Major | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wheeler, Charles Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, George Alphus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lawson, Cheryl Diane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mines, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campbell, Harry Erskine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Weldon, Linger B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Grover Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Plummer, Ernestine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Duke, Newton James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Oden, William B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cooper, Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Minor, Milton M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mears, Walter Marlin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, David L. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Britton, Anderson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kirkland, Harold Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Oakes, Emanuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Timmons, Lionel Nall | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Love, Howard Clyde | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cawthon, Charles William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Higginbotham, Clyde | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawson, William L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McAnnally, Floyd Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Spencer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Segars, Edward Monroe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anderson, Herbert Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rogers, Allen Glenn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Liles, Sherron Daniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cain, Troy D. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Mary Elizabeth Cascio | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Little, Gerald C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shipman, Theo Keith | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sewell, William Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, Willie G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wormley, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Thomas Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moss, James J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cotton, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dillard, Samuel Roston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Riley, Billy Gene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baker, John Jackson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Vonell William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nicholas, Sherman R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Walter Russell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blount, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Card, Dozier | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Norris, David Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Letitia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bridier, Jr., Marcel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harmon, Louie David Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hand, Ira Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dudley, Angela G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Durham, Harry Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Salter, Joseph Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rasco, Morris Gary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Schemmer, Sarah Ann Hendricks | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tibbs, Robert Lee Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Priest, Willis Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Jr., Zack | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Robert L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Leith, Marlin M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nance, Ora | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roscoe, Betty P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Janice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Slaughter, Richard Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, L. T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nance, Oscar Rafe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, John Francis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carpenter, Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payne, Sam Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, Willie Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Sandra Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Lloyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moten, Jr., Sherman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chappell, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, O. J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnston, James Morgan Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barnes, Michael Dennis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Abel, Charles Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, George Washington | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Love, James Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Slaten, Auburn Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Graham, Douglas E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cook, Raymond Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamilton, Tipalias Rolon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Mattie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chaney, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ford, Jr., George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pryor, Edward Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lucy, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reese, Harold Miller | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hollingquest, Christine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Snow, Philip | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Byrd, Mary E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nation, Carl Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Piazza, Vincent | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Luddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alford, Jr., Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ford, William Wilson Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vaughn, Jr., Evans | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Samuel W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilder, Dred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Clarence Herbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scarbrough, Lawrence James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mixon, Veotes | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dees, Robert Crawford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClain, James Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pearl, Ethel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jaynes, Boyd Leander | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stewart, James Buford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Trimble, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ferguson, Carla D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Molette, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chaney, Myron Leotis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ragland, Stella | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perry, Brown Field | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Simpkins, Joseph Bernard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Faggard, Jesse Oliver | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Agee, Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCrorie, James Donald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Ollie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stone, Ronald Eric | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bradford, Erskine Ramsay | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allen, Johnnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cavender, Billie S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
East, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMillan, Byron | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Greene, Eddie Milton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Forbes, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Minor, Grover C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Herman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ray, Judy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cagle, James W. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holyfield, James C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scoggins, Houston L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lynum, David Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perdue, Allen E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boyington, William Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lucas, III, Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roy, L. C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fuller, Willis T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moreland, John Michael | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fells, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Edward Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stevens, Verneta L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sundberg, Morris Ernest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Britton, Robert Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Henry L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Southall, R. Michael | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McElroy, Willie George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McElroy, Wayne S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perry, Bishop Turner | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Palmer, Andrew William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Griffin, Bertha | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Buchanan, Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McEntyre, Barbara | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, Jr., Wilburt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cheatham, Pattie M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gowdy, Kenneth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Black, Rufus Ranald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
St. John, Johnny Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ellis, Webb Carl Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Walter Carl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClain, Leroy Chief | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Connell, Jim W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Orvel Palmer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Manley, John Gordon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ashe, David Allen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Duffner, Leonard Victor | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glenn, Karen B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rhodes, Rufus E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilkins, Tommie Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stenson, Darfet Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mabry, Mary Elizabeth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Wesley M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
SMITH, VERNON | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ellison, Karen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gaston, Jr., Carter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garner, James Harlin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allen, Roswell Walker Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wade, Luke Beverly | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Diggins, Sylvester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Robert Gardner | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Charlene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Savage, Jessie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pope, Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glasscock, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Melvin D. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Norris, James Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Allison Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Richard Warren | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Otwell, Delores | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Malcolm M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Griffin, Elijah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kay, Howard L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hannon, Homer Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Corona, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gibson, Foster L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payne, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Burton Rattis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ridgel, Jerry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Oliver, Martin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fulton, Harold Dean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Steele, Jr., Elijah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Debose, Dedrick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cooper, William Blake Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anthony, Lee Fletcher | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Junious Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rhodes, David Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wrench, Sharon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
George, Jr., Calvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, JOHN | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knight, Tony Gonzales | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boykins, Clare | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Redin, Robert C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pruitt, James Wesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Eddie Earl Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rankin, Willie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alston, Levi | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peoples, Arrick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Thaddeus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, Jesse James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bolton, William Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Ben Franklin Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Swain, Elbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burnett, Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Askew, Jr., Mason | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hines, Jr., James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Orvaria | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campbell, Rayford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Quicksey, Fred James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Chester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henton, Juanaka Renea | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Edwards, Carl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fairburn, Thomas William Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ware, Vann Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Marlowe, Edward Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilkerson, Dicie Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Adams, Andrew Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davidson, Nathaniel Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogan, Jody Lynn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rosser, Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Box, Hollis Ozzo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payton, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lavender, Willie Earl Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Cheryl Lollor | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, John Rufus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, Jack | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bates, Leo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Norton, Farris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stewart, Fred H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Rhonda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
JOHNSON, John Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burcham, David Hassell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Petty, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jamar, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Eaton, John M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Enis, Charlotte | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Byrd, Robert V. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Farris, Dock Shaheen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hayes, Lynch | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cooper, Phillip | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Jr., Houston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Freeman, Reynold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payton, Ossie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sampson, James W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, William O. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robbins, Gilbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hollomon, Excell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Mary Jane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gaines, Johnnie B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Newton, Ronnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Randall Raleigh Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Webb, James Hamby | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McKay, Clayton Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bogus, Willie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Greene, Jr., Adam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Georgia A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, Johnnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Saulters, Gene Tunney | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fees, Virginia Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Weaver, Phillip Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Commons, Andrew Jackson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reed, Fred M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bennett, Gloria J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pate, Clyde Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Anderson Rufus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cross, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campbell, Ronnie Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lovett, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
May, Billy Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lambert, Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brannan, George J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rutledge, John Head | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McEwen, T. K. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hand, John Wesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Salser, Roderick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gulledge, Dudley James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Showers, Donald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Willis, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lawrence, Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
England, George Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Archie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Marable, David M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beaton, Bridgette Juanette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tillie, James H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howell, Sammie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Britton, Harvey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stephens, Donnie Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Willie Lee Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reaves, Charles Peyton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maresette, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brand, Stanley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Atkins, Sim | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bolling, John Henry Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kreider, Donald T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miles, Willie W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gann, James Millard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Statum, Henry Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Sammy Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ramsey, George Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Jr., Ernest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Honeycutt, Richard Demar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Little, Johnnie A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fike, Emmett Earl Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Westry, Earnest Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Saxton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cook, Sulleven | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drake, Marvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Weeks, Dee Arnold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cooks, Ollis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, James W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Rosetta | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Capps, Charles L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ritch, Otis H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, Sarah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Queen Esther Gray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vincent, Richard Glenwood | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Thomas Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Bonseal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Arlin W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Gregory S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pierce, Frank M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parnell, Tommie Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tabb, Jr., Calvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, William Jesse | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Sandra E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Claudious D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knight, Felicia Michelle | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hardy, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Angela W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Jr., Tilmon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
May, William Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Longmire, Erskine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watkins, James Vaulton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rambo, Lawrence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payne, Robert E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Witherspoon, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baldwin, Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hayes, Theodore C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Charles W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jenkins, Edward Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Echols, Willie L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Pervy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Leslie, Sam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dunston, James Garvis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jeffords, Leo Patrick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rosetta, Melissa Annette Beauc | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Richmond, Leslie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Graham, Diana Gayle Estes | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
John, Mary Edith | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Townsend, Earnest Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Montgomery, Harold McLyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Johnnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Tommy Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cole, Nelda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Surwilla | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamilton, Daniel Hugh | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blevins, Lloyd H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Edgar Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chaney, Antonio | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Childers, Eddie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, James O. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Law, Emily | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Ned Willard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Marston, Phillis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tramel, Ronald Alvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pope, Lillie Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dockery, Walter Colquitt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Webster, Ovelyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Owens, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Arnold, Jesse W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Powell, Henry V. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Byrd, Alpha | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burson, Paul Timothy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Roger L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crouch, J. T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anderson, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMickens, Eula Grace | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCoy, Charles Leonard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bass, Gertie Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thurman, Marion J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sharp, Jesse L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Earley, James S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wallace, Elmore | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Bobby Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Talton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
James, Patrick Henry Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waters, Hettie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, Fred Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hibbler, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Langford, Jack David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reaser, Juanita | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Adkins, Jr., Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mullen, Phillip E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Paris, Charles Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, Joseph C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bowden, James Preston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Browder, Elijah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Eugene Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Braden, Harold D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knight, Ell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harbuck, James Madison | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fancher, G. C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chatta, Angelo B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Eugene Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Doby, Coppin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Weathers, Frankie Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roland, Edna G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roberts, Barnett Emerald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pledger, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hall, Joy Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Mary T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McEachern, Dan S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ferguson, Lloyd Gilbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hunton, Minnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Marshall, John L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vizzinia, Joseph V. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mabry, Hellen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Roy Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
May, Joe Tom | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
George, John Henry Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Byron B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barnes, Odell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wallace, Maverick T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gosha, William Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hopper, Billy Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gillis, Jessie L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morgan, Gerald Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cox, Leonard Frances | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Faulkner, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kincaid, Omer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Cleo Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Forister, Horace Curry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carroll, Billie Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Edward Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knight, Dock Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walters, Joe Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baker, Wesley Malon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tillery, Linda C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Buzbee, Roy H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Craig, David W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Easter, Cecil B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, Debra | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Witherspoon, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, DEBRA | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henderson, James Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
JOHNSON, SAMUEL | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Otwell, Ricky A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bonner, James Milstead | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Carl George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morrow, Berlin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ashford, Wilson Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benison, Wilson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bridier, Terry C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Cosby | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winters, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Black, Travis Donald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Wendell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fletcher, William Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Butler, Lee M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClaney, Mattie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Elliott, Cranford Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whetstone, James B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilmore, Ken | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Warmley, Brooks | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Huey, Barbara Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Canada, John Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
South, Lloyd Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bragg, Sam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dorricott, Edwin A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burch, Patricia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Humphrey, Robert James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whitley, Alvin Morgan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rutledge, Alfred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ashford, Samuel Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walburn, Snowden R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Long, Alfred Barker | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walker, LaWanda Davis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lomax, Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ellis, Alphonso | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vance, Huett Lincoln | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brooks, Wilburn L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shaddix, Leonard Bryant | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baldwin, Jr., Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilmer, Samuel Sprott | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wayne, Willie C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Leonard Garcia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Freeman, Nancy A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Castleberry, Anna Christine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Furman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Steely, Arthur John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knox, Loreaner | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Arterberry, Lemar M. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shade, Ida | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamilton, Clifford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Jr., Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Myles, Edward B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herron, Terry Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ross, Lillie Pearl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Raymond Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Handley, Bobby Forest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Samuel C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moody, Trenedda E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reeves, Woodrow Wilson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Jr., Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Grantham, Jack W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
JOHNSON, ROBERT | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cottingham, Rex Earnest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blanton, Henry James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Snead, Matthew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holey, Andrew Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Mack D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Porter, Joseph C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Kenneth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kuzmicki, Lucien Gamiel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hunt, Troy Gene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goodmon, Elijah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beard, Samuel Luther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Daffron, Hugh Lamar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Engram, Evelyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Webb, Aubrey Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, C. B. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woods, Andrew B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harkey, William Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ward, Lugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Plaia, Rosemarie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Timothy S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Freeman, Diane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reynolds, Otto | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Harvey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Young, Robert C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, Henry Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dean, Susan Elaine Berga | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Dennis Buford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hawk, Herman Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waldrup, Robin Annette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carr, William Wallace | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCurdy, Elane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Key, Hazel K. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dempsey, John R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Jr., Houston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Elijah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gover, Jr., Milton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
House, Anderson James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, William T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Osborn, George Wilmer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Echols, James Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winters, William L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Billy Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vines, Jack Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Osburn, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spencer, Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crawford, Mitchel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tate, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spencer, Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Richardson, C. H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Norman, Earnest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hyche, Curtis Arlin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Duncan, William Clary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hall, James Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hawkins, Matthew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, Judy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Jr., Evergreen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ray, Seale Warner | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Ira Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Jessie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gibbons, William McKinley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cheatham, Alfonso | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spann, Gurneth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Willie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cheatwood, Eli Pickens | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Demetria | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garner, Billy Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barrett, Davis Cleveland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, Edward Morris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, James Morris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Betty H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spraggins, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ganus, William L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Porter, Ben Frederick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCutchen, Howard Bradley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sandford, William Talmadge | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Glenn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goodwin, Isabell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
WALKER, ROBERT | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Haney, James C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMickle, Chester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hale, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Stanley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cottrell, Fred J. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Donald Kenneth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gregory, Kenneth Gordon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, John W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sandford, Kenneth Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilkins, Willie D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Nellie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tate, Jr., Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shepard, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Lawson Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roy, Carl Lloyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hilliard, Barbara B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lynn, Noah James David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Caldwell, James Pryor | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cooper, Tommy Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cole, Jr., Montgomery | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Jonnie S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waire, Ezell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cannon, Patricia Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Horton, James W. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
KILPATRICK, DEWPLEA | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Guined, Calvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crear, David Leonard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Starks, James Henry Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kuzmicki, Janice F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Truelove, Fonda Sue Skates | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Daniels, Willie C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
JOHNSON, JOE | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Graham, Isaiah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drake, Jr., Major | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Simmons, Abe Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Armstrong, Gorman Milburn Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamilton, Leslie Hudson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bristol, James Edwin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Morris J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Lenetha | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pearson, Fred Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cumberland, Willie Mason | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, James Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waite, Jim H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spencer, LaDarius C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benson, Herbert Hoover | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Voltz, Jim | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilliam, Elijah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cook, Donald Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hooks, Eunice Jean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Braswell, Jack Rudolf | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Riddle, Willie Davis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dove, Daniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Strawbridge, Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gooden, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Jr., Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dailey, Pearlie Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Craig, Jr., William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hines, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hollingsworth, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Charley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rogers, Murry E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCrary, John Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Catrett, Donna | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Larry Vonell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brake, Jack Edwin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Eugene Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burr, Cecil M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Irons, Ollis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Jr., Dudley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kidd, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Duff, Albert L. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Snyder, Curtis Howell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Carrie L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ingram, Oscar Gay | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perdue, Franklin R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Horsley, Marion Russell Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Getaw, Tom | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roberts, Larry Stephen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Roderick L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McConnell, Louis F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crawford, Owen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Roy J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Elliott, Robert Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crenshaw, Cleotha | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Young, Ronald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamrick, Olon William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Robert Gollie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beavers, Floyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Prewitt, William Nathan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mahan, Lloyd Leldon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Alexander, Dollet | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brodie, Pete Stewart | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Elder, Jr., James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cockrell, Willie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Linda Cathryn (Smith) | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mayfield, Odie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carpenter, Jr., Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nalls-King, Angela Maria | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jernigan, Peter Burch | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burkett, James Roland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, Neal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
REYNOLDS, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Charles Edwin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woods, Constance C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Starks, Arthur Leo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Layton, James Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Elmore, Melo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pate, Sammie Lavell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Long, Jr., Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Christian, Danielle Dawkins | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Praytor, Leon Jackson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spraggins, Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Estes, Bascome Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nalls, Wynell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knox, Austin Miller | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spain, Thomas Gerald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Minard, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Lester Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Louie Dolphus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stewart, Otis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roland, Billy McClendon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Denson, Ira | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Theodus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Elijah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boswell, Earnest Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Rallis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rogers, Willie Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kirkpatrick, Alton William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Oakes, Theodis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lowe, Raymond Maurice Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Noland, John Wesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McKinney, Thomas Jerome | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, LaVerne Lawrence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Frederick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Worford, Julius | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Norwood, Quincy D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Mattie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Gilmore M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Charles M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Penney, John Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carnes, Charles Porter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Jr., Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Overstreet, John Wade | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Ottoway | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henley, James D. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Lonncia Santa | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campisi, Cosmo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Simmons, James Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stephens, Eddie A. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cook, George Emory Terrelle | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chatta, Paul | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Eubert Carl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hardy, Charles Michael Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Contorno, Dixie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Datcher, James Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tarver, Sellers | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Colvin, Rodger | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Banks, Bennie Clifford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hall, Jack | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rhoades, David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Livingston, Nelson Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burnett, James Lloyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fields, J. W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ashley, Sharon Patricia Willia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Willis, John Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Judkins, Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gosnell, Robert Worthy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Barnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ratcliffe, Tommie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Warren, Jesse Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Evans, Hupper | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cook, John Wesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baylor, Herman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, David Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Ginger Lynn Fair | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sandford, Daryl Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Russell, Luretha Oakes | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Jr., charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Leola | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Ralph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henderson, Tom | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parnell, Frederick Loyal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hyche, Herbert Cornell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bailey, L. E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kelly, Billy Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kilgore, Randall Rory | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Timothy Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McDonald, Gerald Wilson Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bowden, William C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Mildred S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
James, Edwin Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Edwards, William D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henry, Jr., Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Masters, Herbert Clayton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Owens, Albert Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McKenzie, Arthur Maye | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vaughn, Squire | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Yancey C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stringer, Jimmy Steel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Riddle, Horace Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chandler, Thomas Erwin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bruce, Bill Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Merriweather, George W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Mavis L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hornbuckle, Marvelene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Castleberry, Billy Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Ricky Renard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brooks, Barbara C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ragland, Benjamin F. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hall, J. D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brock, Jackie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Busby, Grady | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Little, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shaw, Ralph Earl Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Echols, Charles Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fason, Ted Orville | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davison, Robert E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Grooms, Leonard Daniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gosnell, Steven Jan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Quinn, Claude Virgil Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brodie, Raymond Neil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Adair, Goode | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harrell, Arthur Lamar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Page, William T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Files, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Minor, John H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hastings, Otis Lafayette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dowdley, Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pate, Pauline | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mann, Lena E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Willie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morrison, Wanda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chandler, Louis Arnold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, Charles George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Levert, Willie George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morrow, Paul | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ellison, Louis Emery | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Heis, George Phillip | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, Lillie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Horace O. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Palmore, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sullivan, James Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Armour Bud | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maddox, Patricia C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Self, James William Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Orange, Ernest Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Bunnie Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Earl E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Ellis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roton, Ralph Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dinkins, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Conrad Aulton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Darden, Howard William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Odum, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cox, Edward J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Simmons, Hezekiah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dixon, Jr., Wiley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Meacham, Betty Sue Ganey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Belle, Tony Houston Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tate, Artrice Delores | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Calvin, Albert Bennett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Plummer, Randall Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jordan, Royce Garland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Terrell, Brenda J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
EVANS, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Munez, Edwin Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whitt, Jr., Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Culliver, Connie F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hunt, Jr., Sam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
MOORE, Randy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Laird, Earl Allan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lindsey, Raymond | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kynard, Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McQueen, James Weldon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fason, Dura M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Clarice R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drake, Ruth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, Robert R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Poe, Linda Susan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cox, Wilton Glenn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Jonathan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Caudle, William T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Amos, Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Amick, Edward Riley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, Willie Esley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tuggle, Robert Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gowdy, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Essie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, BARBARA | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Mildred H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morgan, Charlie Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gibbs, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dinkins, Fannie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vann, Helen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Caldwell, John S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Byrd, Kenny | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
VINSON, KAY | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Benjamin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sharpe, Jr., George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bush, Gerald Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gillette, Harry Glenn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCarty, Raymond William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Raybon, Robert James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thornton, Thomas Lloyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benson, Ressie A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kidd, Alberta | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burnett, Clyde Terry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hawkins, Jasper | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Joyner, Herbert Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gurganus, Newton General | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Dallas Jack | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hitt, Donald Millard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cherry, Jimmy Drayton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Levert, Calvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Annie Seal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, Hugh B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Emerson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, Charles Milton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crenshaw, Johnnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dodson, Sheila T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Champion, Sanders O'Neal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Owens, Betty Robinson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smedley, William E. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tripp, Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Kenny | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gamble, Langhton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Thomas James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spann, Orson Benjamin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Willie R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCall, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
MITCHELL, JAMES | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ledbetter, George Washington | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Fannie S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bohannon, Cleda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Green, Robert Thedford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Murray, McKinley C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Marlin, Winford Ward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reno, Leon Cornelius | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Oscar Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cain, Michael Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Agee, Flossie Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Avant, Charles H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kilgore, Elva M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, George Milton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Heard, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Ralph Easter Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roberson, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blevins, Arm | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCloud, Mary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Childers, Willie Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Messina, Norman Carlo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Eugene C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Horton, Willie Cute | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Jessie P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davison, Jacqueline | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Proffitt, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hollins, Shirley E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sartain, Joseph Edgar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sapp, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Givan, Milton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hambright, Clemmie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harp, Jackie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hendrix, Walter James Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Marshall, John Elmore | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McAlister, William Herbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Harvey Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Marshall, Andrew W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, Alma | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whitley, John H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spencer, Coster | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cribbs, William T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Lee Wilkins | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garner, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hines, Robert Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campbell, James Paul | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lowery, William Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nichols, Milis L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Green, Paul Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Grigsby, Elba Kenneth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
White, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benion, John Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Page, Glover C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, George H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gentry, Grover L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ganus, Ruby L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamaker, George Martin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Colburn, George Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Letson, Ronald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hardin, Claude K. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McEwen, Leona Ruth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hauenstein, Barbara Kay Braswe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Andrew Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Christian, Herman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hampton, Thomas E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Durer, James Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dill, Soloman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thrash, Adam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gibbs, Jr., Paul | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cooper, Charles Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Lawrence Edward Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mallory, James David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wallace, Allen E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brasseale, Emery Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stinson, Betty J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pinkard, Mathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Avery, Sam Paul | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, J. L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Grant, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waldrup, Judith Lynn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilmore, Brenda Joyce Gosnell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, Wydell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Bobby Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Willie Roy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Alfonso | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Seal, Virginia Louise | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, George Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crenshaw, Ernest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Freeman, Samuel S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawkins, Kizzie L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
DeFranco, Joseph Anthony | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dial, Sarah E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, MARILYN | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reece, John Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bowden, Betty | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Debose, Ollie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Henry Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Black, Richard Gordon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, ANDREW | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Griffis, James Claude | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pike, Raymond A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bush, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Speagle, Daniel Lafeyette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Urquhart, Thomas James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Calvert, J. D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Echols, Barbara Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hannah, Kelsey Lonzo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Macon, Thelma | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Laningham, James Acie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Agee, Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Click, John Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bush, Michael G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, Anderson Daniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hearn, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mann, John Madison | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Felton, Jimmie Nell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holloway, Deidra Delores | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baltimore, Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Houston, Jesse | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hooks, Ephriam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shivers, Linda | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watkins, Jr., Luther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pate, Bernadine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bennette, John H. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Andrew Carter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dudley, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Byrd, Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Forshee, Gerald Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Rose Marie Chappell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Jr., Jacob | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ferguson, Jimmie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dancy, Percy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, Willie Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mason, Teresa Williams | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mann, Joe Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hicks, Jimmie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vickery, Wesley Herman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Byers, Beason | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
George, James A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waldrop, Clarence Gurley Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McFarland, Cindy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sizemore, Thomas Calvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Richards, Clifford Duane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Milton Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gross, Carter Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hudson, Royce | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bailey, George Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ridgel, Morris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spidle, Mamie Lou | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henton, Elaine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mason, Diane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, David Lee Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stone, Daniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carman, Johnnie B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Levert, Raymond | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClaney, Scottie Yvette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Farrell, Clarence Elmore | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Frazier, John Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chappell, Rosebud | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Alfred Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Jr., Emanuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gallups, Onnie Jane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bailey, Debra Darlene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Letson, Billy Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hyden, Gus Terrel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, Billy Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McKinnon, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Walter Melvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fillingame, James Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holyfield, Ollie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Farr, Max Bemoore Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, Tommy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Finley, Leo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herron, Willie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Bernice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dickey, Lawrence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morris, Hubert Clinton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Edwards, Stanley T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, George Pershing | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chambers, Doris McGhee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Elliott, Robert C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ray, Odies | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Robert Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCrary, Norman Gene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mize, Maurice Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tabb, Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Verdell B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Estes, Jasper Buford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Jr., Shed | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garrett, Hubert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Estes, Mary Belle | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crawford, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ingram, Ross Pershing | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Matthews, David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dance, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dunn, Millard L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Echols, Loretta | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, William Jasper | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, Phillip Dale | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Austin, Sandra | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Logan, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Debose, Jacquese J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mines, Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Seaborn, Sam Phillip | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hitt, Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kay, James Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ware, James Ralph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roman, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Earnest Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Elizabeth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Joe Nathan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Arleen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Margaret, Julia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hollifield, Douglas Hamilton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rutledge, Bessie Davis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, John Falls | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pitts, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Nathan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Billingsley, Arthur Brooks | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
DeBardlabon, Herman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, O. Hiram Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harper, Eugene Livingston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Haynes, Oliver Julian | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chaney, Jr., Enouch | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Page, Jack | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hoffman, James B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Johnny Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Layton, Jodie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
George, Norman M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Whiting, Allen Bright | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rogers, Edward Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mims, Billie Gene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, Albert Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hawkins, Monroe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gosnell, Michael Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Borden, Floyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wood, Melvin Lane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
DeLemus, Arthur Wilbur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cuchiara, Philip | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ellis, Chester Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dubose, Samuel L. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crawford, Leslie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herring, Eugene Arnold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Daniels, Lowell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Golden, Dolphist Leo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, William James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Higdon, Terry Randal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Franklin Dennis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, William Warren | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Singleton, Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Starks, Clarence James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Joe Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Means, Woodrow | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, Joseph Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lloyd, Eulala Elizabeth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kay, Bobby Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hendricks, James W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peoples, Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Charles W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boggarty, Jr., Harrison | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glass, Otis L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Malone, Gwendolyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Seals, James A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allen, James Ralph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Young, Owen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Berga, Beulah Mae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waugh, Ivan T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Westbrook, Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Price, Jr., Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
St. John, James Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Meads, C. S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hayes, L. V. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blue, Ethel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Golden, Bobby Lane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Snead, John Logan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gossett, Mortimore E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ogletree, Calvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kornegay, Willie Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Banks, Willie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gee, Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rembert, Patrick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morris, William Marcell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, William Morris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, Robert H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Arrick, Jr., David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Belcher, James Felix | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Halfacre, James C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vinson, Clinton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rush, Melvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watson, Christine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Corey A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garner, Wilsie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Mel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
May, Joe Hill | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Edwards, Paul | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McKee, Noah Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campbell, Arthur Lee Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Little, Jimmie Lee Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cox, Frederick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henslee, Ernest Reese | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cook, Howard Carroll | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ridgel, Neal Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bush, Richard B. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anthony, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Eddie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Higdon, George Bruce | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Fermon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williamson, Rita Kaye | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gugliotta, Norman J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spraggins, Jimmy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Jr., Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kennedy, Charles Kenneth | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Guy, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gunnin, Milton Newton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barksdale, Howard C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Streeter, John Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Malone, Jr., Otis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ball, Alma | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moss, Eddie L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hastings, Ganett B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pratt, Wileather | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCain, Ruel C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brooks, Victoria | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baldy, Jimmy Royce | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spidle, Terry Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, John H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vanhoozer, Robert L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Albert Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brooks, Clint Elmore | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McGinnis, David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brascome, John W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kidd, Jr., Herbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nevett, Samuel Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Donald W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Sam A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garmany, Hershell Waldo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walker, R. D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bledsoe, Jr., Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bickerstaff, Elizabeth A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fox, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Piper, Lonnie Urssery | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bynum, Jake Lamar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watkins, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williamson, Kathy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gordon, James D. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Sabrina | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Daniels, Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Murray, Henry James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCarroll, Johnny Huey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herring, Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bauer, John David II | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bragg, Viola | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crenshaw, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wormely, Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Covin, Carl William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carlton, Arnold Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crosby, Howard Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Steward, Soney | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barbour, Horace Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wiggins, Thaddeus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Curtis, George Gilmore Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Schor, Jean Giles Schor | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hodges, George William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Johnny R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClendon, Kenneth Othell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stacey, Robert Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campbell, Grover C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Berry, Willie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Averhart, Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shrum, Billy Gene Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Osburn, Corey B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Long, Dorother | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
WRENCH, JOHNNIE MAE | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Copeland, Maple Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fitts, Lester Onton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, William Loyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, William James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goodwin, Curtis H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dabbs, Boyd Grey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Horn, Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sneed, Lawrence Thomas Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Arterberry, Jr., Lemar M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Adams, A. D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wood, Johnnie Harvie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Greer, Elvee Mines | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rush, Roger | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rogers, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bush, Robert Woodrow | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Wilburt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Julius | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allen, Kathalyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gardner, Chauncey Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kilgore, Robert Ricky | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Isbell, TYERS RAYMOND | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tucker, Charles Willis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, III, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Posey, Jack A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Jimmie Daniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Guest, William Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bunt, Billy Burrough | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maiden, Jr., Sidney | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Card, Dell Sena | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, Oscar Cowles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Weatherly, John Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Foney, Oneil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vaughn, Pierre Duncan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kincaid, James Monroe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Braswell, Walter R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClaney, Willie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harville, Rufus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davidson, Yvonne L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gosa, Joe Cypha Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dougherty, George Herbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Howard Dave | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
E. I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMP | Petitioner | Ms. Molly H. Hatchell Mr. Mike A. Hatchell Ms. Sandra French Clark Mr. M. C. Carrington Ms. Elizabeth B. Pratt |
Addaway, Floyd Cosper Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Herman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holt, Joseph Jordan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogeland, Emmett B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ennis, Stanley B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Martin, Julius | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mabry, William Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Poe, Donald T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hood, Anthony | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barbour, LaSandra Anderson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Garfield | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lusain, Jr., Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, Robert Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, James Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Singer, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Powell, Jr., Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Foley, William A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ragland, Jr., Linder | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Skates, Doris H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Humphrey Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sims, Harry G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Talley, Charles Curtis Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boglin, Jr., George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Roy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Story, Melvin Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawson, Lola | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Andrews, Richard Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Aaron | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kaiser, Paulette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clement, Richard R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crane, Raymond | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Slaughter, R. B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, Goldman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Perry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Austin, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Plump, David James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, Charlie Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Daffron, Vernon K. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McKinley, Herman Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Willie Ervin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Turner, Lou David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baker, Lottie Belle | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Tommie C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boyd, Wilbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perry, Elmore Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reese, Clinton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barnes, Edgar L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Dewey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Munford, Frank Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Urquhart, Lonnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Craig, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Motes, Ada M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Freeman, Claude Fredrick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Butts, Opal Dockins | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McNeil, Perry H. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Finch, James Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Edwards, Mitchell Tyrone | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kiel, Naomi | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wolfe, Charlie Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Winter, Stephen T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Neal, J. L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Warren, William Harris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Richard, Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jolly, Nunn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Byrd, Frederick D. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fikes, Geraldine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Norton, Dorothy Jean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Naylor, J. C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carlisle, Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perryman, Joseph Morris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fredrick, Walter Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClain, Earnest | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Johnny L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Bradford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
St. John, Wallace W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gowdy, Hattie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Avant, Winston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Piazza, Susan Camille Bruce | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gildersleeve, Charlie George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McEachern, Faye C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gallegly, Johnnie Frances | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dollar, Donna Jo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Osburn, Portia F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Byrd, William Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Claybourne, Tom | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCurdy, Cora Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Quinn, Cecil Everett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Skates, John Wesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pruitt, Chester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Callahan, John Paul | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Otis Dale | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hanks, Ernest Burtrand Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holmes, Eddie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Jerry L. R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Enoch | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, H. D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Oliver, Willie Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ayres, Brenda Gayle Berga | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spencer, Frances | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brady, B. M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Underwood, John Allen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ford, Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Earl A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawson, Gail | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Strait, Earvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mines, Elizabeth Knight | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Granger, Walter Colquitt Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Ocie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pope, Rutherford B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Leonard, Huley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Elijah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woodard, Theopolis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Harrison | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henderson, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wiggins, James Huey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Lafayette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brady, Clara M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carmichael, Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Motley, Charles Luther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hudson, Benjamin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baxter, Jr., William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peeples, Wesley Stewart | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hudson, Cameron | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Drake, Charlie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Youngblood, Alphonzo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Porter, Lamar Cowart | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Noe, Ruben Willard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dorsett, Cecil Riley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allen, Morris Clinton Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dowdell, Marshall | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Erskine L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harvey, Laura Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Childress, Alfred Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bivins, C. J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sfakianos, John Constantine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peacock, Jack M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pendleton, Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wiley, John David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goins, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, Hayes | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, Jr., Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Huins, Alice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lankford, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benson, Morris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waldrup, Robert H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Denton, Ronnie Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Lee Ernest Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Simmons, Miller | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sandell, James Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, ED | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McDonald, David Alexander | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scales, J. C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Colvin, Beulah | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davison, Ada B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tortorice, Charles Mitchell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watts, James H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Clarence Redford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gallups, Randy Ellis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bryant, Lawrence Pernell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allen, Jr., Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crawford, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watson, Booker T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brundidge, Walter Mack | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Macon, Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hollingsworth, Gus Leonard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, III, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Banks, Jr., Tommy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Robert L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Robert George Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bevels, Charles Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Claude Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lacey, Paula Edwards | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClain, Charles William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sandford, Mabry Ozell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ephraim, Miriam Laverne Chaney | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Atchison, Robert Bruce | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Upshaw, Roland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hooks, James Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mims, Alberta | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Edward L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Emmert, Jacob Glenn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henson, Wiley C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sizemore, Benjamin A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bankhead, Coy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payton, Carey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mixon, Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Marion | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gober, Douglas Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Eddie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Graham, Charles Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Byrd, Martha | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, Jr., Clifford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Elmore, Chester E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Riley, Donald Carson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Owens, Gloria | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rutledge, Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Ronald L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pickett, Alfredia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crow, Euell Raymond | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Pinkie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, Hyram G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perryman, Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robbins, Donald Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tate, Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, James Cleovues | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Elliott, Eugene Evans | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Giles, Thomas E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Armstrong, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cunningham, Winston Dan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chaney, John Wesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clark, Deborah Mae Berga | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dunson, Jr., Jimmie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chaney, Obray Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wells, Robert Benjamin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Lucius James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fowler, Joseph Linwood | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waldrup, Frances Gail | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fitts, Nettye Jo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mathis, Herbert Ramsey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Charles Gail | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, John Raymond | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mushatt, Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Adams, Charlie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pettway, Sears | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McKinney, Felix | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, Vester L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Strickland, Alfred Frank Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lane, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cox, Evelyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Powell, Carey Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Margret | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Ressie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, John Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Merrida, David Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Maiden, Annie L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mattison, Clinton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burnett, Wilford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glover, Fred William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holloway, Marlon LeCount | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Oliver, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ezelle, Elbert Gray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sims, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rutledge, Jr., Jasper Jack | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Swearingen, Winsor Howell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pleasant, Jimmy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smiley, Abraham | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bennett, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sides, Charles Russell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Terrell, Jr., Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Essex, Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moody, Jr., David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ray, Pascal Elexander | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lawrence, Lattie M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chamblee, William Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nelson, II, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holt, Melvin Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bowden, Jr., Randolph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patton, Earnest H. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glass, Kathy A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Batain, Clarence Ed | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hartley, James William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beauchamp, William Hal | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shoemaker, Hugh Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hall, Adolphus Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pilkerton, Robert Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kimbrel, Michael Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peterson, Tommie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McElroy, James Johnson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Earnest Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ridgel, Herbert C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shackelford, Jess I. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hereford, Robert William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Tilmon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Culwell, James Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
O'Dazier, Ruby M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lawrence, Inez P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hardy, Jason Stanley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Junious | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garrett, Charlie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Baker, Jr., Collin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wages, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kuzmicki, Annie W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holmes, Homer Frank Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Alfred L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crim, Chiqucita Renae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anderson, Dianne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campisi, Vita Rose | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Humphryes, Horace Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brasfield, Kenneth Jerry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Headley, James Pinkney | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
JACKSON, ROBERT | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carruba, Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, O. D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goolsby, Alfred R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payne, Franklin D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shearer, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Myers, Hudson Stone | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Black, Charles Keith | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Deaton, Sonja Faye Stallings | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Merritt, Van dee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nixon, Shirley M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cezar, Delmer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Marable, Henry Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Campbell, Chester Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ivy, Judy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Richardson, Willie A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reed, Joe L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Arrick, Cedric Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tew, Cary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bonds, Cosby Wilder | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holyfield, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wallace, Garrett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pope, Jr., Nathaniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClain, Alfonso | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Box, Vernon W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wallace, Ernest Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Jesse Lee Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pruitt, Lawson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jenkins, W. T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nicholson, Harold Garrett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peterson, Jessie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McKenzie, Ben Gibson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Deloris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blackerby, Fred C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hathcox, Jimmy Hugh | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Catherine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Julius D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barksdale, Monte | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Steele, Margaret | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ragland, Major | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ford, James L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rudolph, Sidney | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moudry, Joseph Louis Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilkerson, Virgil G. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Swain, Johnnie Jewles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Browning, Jr., Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tarrant, Alexander | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woods, Charlie Lewis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ray, Winfred Holmes | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Edney, Thomas Curtis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, Ennis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fleck, Junie William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Keel, Raymond J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Marshall, George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McAlpine, Teresa | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Murry, Daniel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Helton, Lester Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sellers, Ralph Patrick | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Phillips, Lula | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Christian, James A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Arnold Kermit | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cannon, Dorman D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crowder, William Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gay, Doyle Ruben | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ranke, Debra Marie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Stanley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Garrett, Realius | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Malone, Wallace | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bradford, Dennison L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Schmitt, Marcel N. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Akers, Arthur Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blaylock, Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stirtmire, Nelson Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fausett, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Alma Rae | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Warren, Malcolm Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henderson, James Floyd | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ware, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Elliott, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hudson, Martha | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Amos B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Glover, William Alfred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morgan, Woodrow Wilson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hayes, Willard Bernard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilmore, Linda Gail | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cobb, Jr., Graham | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Doyle, Jesse | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Page, Thurmon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barrow, Henry Wallace | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scroggins, Jeanette | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Simon, Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thornton, James Elmon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rose, Cecil Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Flanagan, Consie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bloomingburg, Mary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hinton, Eddie Will | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Larriett, Lonnie F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Curry, Jr., Albert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dutton, Virginia Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Joseph B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawson, Leo Allen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Andrews, Lavert Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
George, Lela | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Willis Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Owens, Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harland, Jack Marshall | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tolbert, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gunn, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Tommie Glenn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, Jr., Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, James Warren | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Tijuana | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Heath, Julius Calvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tyler, Earnest S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dawkins, Fannie R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
HARRIS, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Biffle, Marzean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carpenter, Edward Clemon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henton, Robert Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hudson, Chris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cox, Wilton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sears, Arthur James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Robert Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tate, Bobby C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Arterberry, Larry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Jr., Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, C. P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Knopf, Ralph Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jenkins, Jr., Prince | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fry, Hubert H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mason, L. B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wakefield, Jimmy Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dunbar, Jimmy Clyde | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herring, James Melvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Marion Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamilton, Joseph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wier, Thomas B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nesbitt, Lee E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smitherman, Eugene Elmore | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Griffin, John Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hannon, Carnell I. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Horton, Michael Allen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Avant, Willie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Devridge, O. C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Gayle | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Green, Napoleon Bonaparte | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Heath, Alvin Dixon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payton, James D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gilbert, Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Traywick, Jr., Jasper | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chamberlain, Ena Patricia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Amerson, William George | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shaner, Asa Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gibson, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wilson, Hugh | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gaither, Raymond Clayburn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Harry Shelby | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perdue, Joe Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Finley, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morgan, Henry Cary | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watts, Frances | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davison, Shelton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Little, J. P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kennedy, Willie Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woods, Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Yarbrough, Henry Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nichols, Floyd Earl Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ellis, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cotton, Hollie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Jr., Zester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moody, David | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Barbara Judkins | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hathcoat, Wilbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bridier, Gerald Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brooks, Benjamin Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bedrick, Mary Florence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
WASHINGTON, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Downs, Margie Jean M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Agee, Hervy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Douglas, Mary B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lepper, Harry Marsh | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, Sam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Andrew | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Franklin, Shelby Jean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jemison, Brunetta M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hogeland, Michael L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Deborah Bernita | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wright, Willie Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Charley, Jr., Mack | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Servarntes, Alice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crocker, David Davidson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Merritt, Braxton Vance | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hooks, Elnathan | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bates, John Alvis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patton, Randy K. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, Amos Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hudson, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Alphonse | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jordan, Jr., Eddie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gibbs, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Devaughn, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Salze, Charles L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, John Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rogers, George Warren | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Craid, Evelyn Jones | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kilburn, Melvin Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, James Clyde | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Henry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Saruse, Jimmie John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spears, Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Archer, Charles Richard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCaffrey, Benjamin C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, Charlie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stevens, Lenora | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roscoe, William James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lampkin, R. T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perkins, Albert Vernon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cobern, James Clinton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pelt, Clifford Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Major | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nichols, Willard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hayes, Ethel D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robinson, Eddie B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Falconer, Hilus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Young, John T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Amason, James Dean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wallace, Johnie Jean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Mose | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Duke, Hoyt Aubrey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moore, William Buster | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Murphy, Norman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Amos, Jackie Marie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clifton, Garland Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watts, I. D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woods, Tamera Eileen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lofton, Calvin B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Groom, Jr., Hosea | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fowler, Billy Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Evans, Caroline | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, Aubry Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chandler, William James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Perkins, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, Myra | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ealons, John Luther | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Findley, Cooledge L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Humphries, John L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jackson, Hugh | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Rubbie L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Butera, Vincent Anthony Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Dewey Austin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Marcella Denise | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Beam, Robert Byron | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sundberg, Vadie R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walden, Charles B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fitts, Ezell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goodwin, Bennie E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ward, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Cynthia D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lacey, Charles Hugh | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shiver, Walter T. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chapman, Arthur L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hughes, Johnnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Newell, Robert Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sizemore, William Patrick Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lane, Violet Louise Jones | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wallace, Alfred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dumas, Crawford Jenkins | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Madeline | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roy, Samuel L. III | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rankin, Joseph P. Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Driver, Marvin Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Webster, Betty Joyce | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harvey, Charlie Seay | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chappell, Eleanor L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, George William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Felder, Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burchfield, James Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Inez B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walker, Willie Ulysee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goldsby, James Ellis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Duncan, Jr., Bill | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ivey, Homer Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Boone, Milton Patterson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Wesley | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Marlin, Hardy Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Grace, Cleveland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Foti, John | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fairbanks, Willie Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shepard, Albert Tyson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCafferty, Jr., Hobson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Forman, Lesley Gable | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Acoff, Chrinstine Dobbins | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hill, Howard Houston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Everett, Robert B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cummings, Frederick Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dean, Jerri Amos | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rogers, Robert Malcolm | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peterson, Will Rogers | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Edwin Donald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johns, Cecil Phinn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Collins, Ralph Donald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Claudette Judkins | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Romine, James Eldridge | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Harris, Warren Harden | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mobley, Glenda W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rogers, Elbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peoples, Pamela | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davidson, L. D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, Jerry Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hulett, Evans Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mowery, Charles L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Peoples, Ellen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Robert Melvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sims, Raymond Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lyles, Abraham Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Abbott, Augustus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pryor, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sizemore, Vonnie V. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Payne, Ernest Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Clay Brian | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gurosky, Louis C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stricklin, Travis Dalton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thomas, Jimmie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, James Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stockley, Robert L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, Namon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kimbrough, Samuel Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Burton, Patrick Vernon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reaves, Luther Eugene | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Battles, William M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lavett, William Ardyr | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wyatt, Calvin Leroy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Simpkins, Leslie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Green, Louise | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Reaves, Richard Ted | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, GEORGE | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cockrell, Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Ross Ferrell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Trannon, Garfield | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, John S. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Thompson, Fred J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scott, David Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
DuBose, Tom Davis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ray, Addie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pate, Clarence Wilbur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Bennie W. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wigley, David J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ward, James Parker | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wade, Shelia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Walker, Charlie Waldo | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Jackie Dean | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Byrd, Ralph O. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
James, O. C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McNeely, William A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Epting, Major Issac | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Herrod, Young | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Newberry, Cleophus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Houston | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Zito, Frank Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tennyson, Lonnie Jackson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Earnest, Jerry Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bolden, John Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Elliott, Idus Williams | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Jeanie P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brady, A. J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mitchell, Elias Howard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lee, Thomas Solister | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Merritt, Anita O. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McClain, Edward Browning | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Plan, George P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dunn, Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Myles, Edward Bell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vines, John Randolph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pugh, James A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Marshall, Thomas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Willis, Joyce L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roy, Joseph E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Forman, Charles | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Stubbs, Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cherry, Janet L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, Clarence Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allen, Joseph Harvey | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McGuirk, William Roy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lewis, Stephen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McWhorter, J. Ann Pugh | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Henderson, A. P. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gary, Lovick Robert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Belew, John Roland | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Curren, Clara | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Swann, Ray Adolphus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Epperson, William Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hudson, Hosea Herman | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waldrup, Lisa Diane | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kelley, Beatrice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brewer, Isaac Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Alex | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vines, Danny L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nixon, Effie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Clifton, Robert Glenn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Moon, Christopher Columbus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chancellor, Charles Lindburgh | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fix, Richard Snow | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Little, Jessie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Ray | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Lee Ward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, Kathryn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Todd, Sylvester | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Porter, Chianne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morrow, Thomas E. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pace, Alice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Street, Clarence Alfred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Robertson, Harold Clark | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Benjamin, Roosevelt | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, Allie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tanksley, Jacqueline Wells | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Carter, Edward Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Clayton Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cox, Elvira Fuller | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Schober, Frank William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lavies, Robert Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Postell, Timothy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mosley, Leon | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spulling, James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Berry, Timothy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fisher, Alfred Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Postell, Terry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goodwin, Harold C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Caldwell, Jim | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McMickens, Deborah Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Joiner, George Alford | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bowers, Katherlene Rembert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pearson, Paul Denton | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pettway, Arthur Louis | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holman, Jr., James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kendrick, Herbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Wood, Renee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Roland, Jr., Sam | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
JONES, Jack | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Holyfield, Samuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Porter, Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brown, Katie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sellers, Vernon Harris | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
King, Walter Herbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Dorsey, Alto | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mack, Renee Thompson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Love, Carmon Brice | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spain, William Walter Calvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jones, Gregory Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Isaac | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hayes, Vergil | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamby, Angela L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Miller, Virginia D. R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, Essie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cain, Frances Lucille | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Kitt, Emanuel | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fairer, Jr., Clarence | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, William Rudolph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lowe, Jr., Herbert | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Scurlock, Victor Frank | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Henderson | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hinton, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Ezelle, Hugh Douglas | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tucker, Jeffrey Ronald | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pollard, Anthony Steven | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smitherman, Charles Lindberg | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morton, David Meldee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McCaskey, Arthur | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McFollie, Schaffer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Chapman, Lonnie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, Homer | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hollis, Shellie Fred | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gary, Jerome | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Davis, William Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Deason, Roy Festus | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woody, E. H. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rivers, Edward L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nance, Jerry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Batson, Walter Lee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Anderson, Willie Clyde | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Rice, Annie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Prather, James Morgan Jr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Jean, Emma | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Mickles, Johnny Elvin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Allen, Marshall | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Vincent, Thomas L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Johnson, Washington Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamilton, Billy J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lockhart, Walter | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Crane, Judy Ann | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Woody, Bob Green | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bend, Elmore Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Palmore, Jeff Perry | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gallups, Sam Timothy | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Spand, Edgar | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Swindle, Patricia | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Shack, Howard Lovell | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
McBrayer, Robert Willard | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Gray, John M. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Barron, Terry Dewayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Coleman, Zebedee | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Watson, Joe | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
VanDyke, Joan Carolyn | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Patterson, Gregory | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sizemore, Charles R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Morgan, Virgil Gaines | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Newton, Earl | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Waller, Diane Pope | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Nichols, Ralph D. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Heron, James Jarrett | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sanders, Eddie James | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Pettus, Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Blevins, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Williams, Harold | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Cox, Richard Allen | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Taylor, Clarence C. Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Tumlin, Dena Rhea | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Fletcher, Sidney | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Hamilton, Columbus J. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Lofton, Catherine | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Faniel, J. B. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Broadnax, Eddie L. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Howard, James Ralph | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Camp, William | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
SMITH, WILLIE LEE | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Smith, Jr., Ransom | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Sparks, Edward | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Brasher, Richard Wayne | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Speed, Zion | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Goggins, James Franklin | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Powell, Kenneth Leon Sr. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Bell, R. C. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Parker, James R. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Snider, Leonard A. | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Means, Willie | Respondent | Mr. Richard J. Clarkson |
Court of Appeals Information:
09-98-00061-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
986 SW2d 82, 02-18-99
9th Court of Appeals
Honorable DON BURGESS
Trial Court Information
128th District Court
Orange
Honorable Patrick Allen Clark
A-920,961-C