Case Information: 82-CM-1532 | |||
Short Caption: | BETHEA, DONALD EDWARD UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 11/04/1982 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 11/04/1982 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 07/14/1983 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 12/28/1983 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 04/03/1984 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | BETHEA, DONALD EDWARD UNITED STATES | |||
11/04/1982 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
07/14/1983 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
12/28/1983 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
04/03/1984 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
04/06/1984 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |