Case Heading (S-18-0186) | |||||
Case Number: | S-18-0186 | Case Docketed On: | 08/16/2018 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Eighth Judicial District Goshen County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL REQUEJO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL REQUEJO, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Christopher Michael Requejo | Diane M. Lozano Kirk Allan Morgan David E. Westling |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael Christyne Marie Martens Caitlin Frances Harper Darrell Duane Jackson Catherine M. Mercer Jenna N. Niehl |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Procedure |
Opinion Number: | 2019 WY 44 |
Citation: | 439 P.3d 747 (Wyo. 2019). |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
08/16/2018 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
08/16/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
08/16/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
10/02/2018 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
10/02/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received Designation of Record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/16/2018 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
11/16/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval | Notice-Incoming | Consent and Approval | Final | |
11/19/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; Consent and Approval; and copy of designation of record. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/04/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/11/2018 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
12/12/2018 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume 1, Original Papers; Volume 2, Transcripts (4 total); Volume 3, Confidential Folder; Volume 4, Exhibits. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/18/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Westling o/b/o Appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
12/18/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Caitlin Harper for Jenna Niehl obo Appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
01/16/2019 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Davis, Justices Fox, Kautz, Boomgaarden and Gray (David E. Westling o/b/o Appellant; Christyne Martens and Jenna N. Niehl, student intern, argument by Ms. Niehl, o/b/o Appellee) and taken under advisement. | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
04/19/2019 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming with Justice Kautz writing for the court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
05/07/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
05/07/2019 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
05/07/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
05/07/2019 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
05/09/2019 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated) | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |