judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00368-CR
04-81-00368-CR
12/14/1981
Other Felony
McGehee, Frank B.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
09/29/1983Mot. EOT t/f Pet. for Disc. Review DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/02/1983Mot. EOT t/f Pet. for Disc. Review Filed
07/01/1983Mandate Issued
07/01/1983Mandate Issued
05/13/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/04/1983Response to Motion Filed
04/28/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/12/1983Mot. EOT to file Brief FiledMotion or Writ Denied
04/12/1983Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/11/1983Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
04/08/1983Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/16/1983Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/15/1983Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/02/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/02/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/23/1983Submission
02/23/1983Submission
02/23/1983Submitted
01/28/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/28/1983Case ready to be set
01/17/1983Response to Motion Filed
12/22/1982Mot. f/l/file Response DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/16/1982Mot. f/l/file Response Filed
11/29/1982Mot. f/l/file Response DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/23/1982Mot. f/l/file Response Filed
11/17/1982Mot. f/l/file Response DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/15/1982Mot. f/l/file Response Filed
10/28/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
12/14/1981Record Filed
12/10/1981Record Approved
10/29/1981Motion EOT to file Objections DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/26/1981Notice of appeal received
10/26/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/16/1981Motion EOT to file Objections Filed
10/14/1980Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
10/14/1980Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
216th Judicial District Court
Kerr
Honorable Robert Barton
3,208
10 years probation