Case: 97-0810
97-0810
09/10/1997
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
WILLIAM E. WOOD and JOE C. VEALE SR. individually or d/b/a JV'S PIT BBQ
NORMAN G. HADDAD d/b/a UNIVERSITY HILLS PLAZA SHOPPING CENTER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
10/14/1997 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
09/10/1997 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
01/23/1998 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | case stored | | |
11/13/1997 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | Pet for Review denied | |
10/20/1997 | Notice requesting filing fee | $10.00 for reply not paid letter sent to Ronald R. Calhoun | | |
10/20/1997 | Petitioner's reply brief | | | |
10/14/1997 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
10/14/1997 | Response to Petition | | | |
09/10/1997 | Petition for Review | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
01/23/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 29D4 record returned |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
WOOD, WILLIAM E. | Petitioner | Mr. Ronald R. Calhoun |
UNIVERSITY HILLS PLAZA SHOPPIN | Respondent | Mr. Daniel R. Malone |
VEALE, SR., JOE C. | Petitioner | Mr. Ronald R. Calhoun |
HADDAD, NORMAN G. | Respondent | Mr. Daniel R. Malone |
JV'S PIT BBQ | Petitioner | Mr. Ronald R. Calhoun |
Court of Appeals Information:
08-97-00015-CV
Affirmed/Rev'd & Rem'd
949 SW2d 438, 07-03-97
8th Court of Appeals
Honorable SUSAN LARSEN
Trial Court Information
168th District Court
El Paso
96-4124