judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOUGLAS PETER SZYMANSKI v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-106)
Case Number:06-106Case Docketed On:05/17/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:DOUGLAS PETER SZYMANSKI v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DOUGLAS PETER SZYMANSKI, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDouglas Steven SzymanskiD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Daniel Michael Fetsco

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 139
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/17/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/17/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/17/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/25/2006Notice-Incoming - Other - received copy of court reporter's certification of completion.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/30/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/05/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/03/2006Motion - Other - Pro se motion for production of all court transcripts and records from April 1, 2005 to the present. No service made, sent copy to PD and AG this date.MotionOtherFinal
08/18/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/21/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/22/2006Order - Deny - motion for production of transcriptsOrderDenyFinal
10/03/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/05/2006Order - Grant - third extension of time - no further.OrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
11/06/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
12/18/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/19/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/27/2006Motion - Other - pro se motion to deny the appellee extension of time to file brief.MotionOtherFinal
01/02/2007Order - Deny - pro se motoin to deny the appellee extension of time to file briefOrderDenyFinal
02/02/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/05/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/21/2007Brief - Appellee; and received copy on disk and designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/12/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes: Volumes I and II, original papers; Volumes III and IV, transcripts; Volume V, confidential documents.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/16/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/18/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - KerinNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/23/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Terry L. Armitage, Deputy Attorney GeneralNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Terry Armitage, Deputy Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/29/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/14/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/14/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/18/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal