judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AMERICAN MACHINE TOOL NATIONAL PERMANENT FEDERAL

Case Information: 80-CV-1196
Short Caption:AMERICAN MACHINE TOOL NATIONAL PERMANENT FEDERALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA2121-78Filed Date:10/15/1980

Opening Event Date:10/15/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/17/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/27/1981
Argued/Submitted:09/10/1981
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Robert E. O'Malley NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
George H. Beuchert NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901AMERICAN MACHINE TOOL DISTRIBUTORS ASSOCIATION NATIONAL PERMANENT FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION
10/15/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/17/1981FiledRecord Completed
03/27/1981FiledBriefing Completed
09/10/1981FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/27/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition