judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EICON VS. WARREN

Case Information: 34672
Short Caption:EICON VS. WARRENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A379939Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/27/1999 / Dentico, MichaelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/16/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07633
08/27/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael V. Dentico. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/29/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 2, 1999. 99-11874
12/15/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Requesting an extension of time beyond 120 days or 12/27/99. 99-12665
04/10/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-05671
04/10/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-05672
04/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is hereby dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs. 00-06747
04/26/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.