Case: 8187
8187
08/31/1943
Application for Writ of Error
K. HUGHES, ET AL., HECTOR CRANDALL, STATE OF TEXAS
ALBERTO BALLI, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/26/1945 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
04/26/1945 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
04/06/1945 | Supplement to Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
04/06/1945 | Supplement to Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
03/13/1945 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
03/13/1945 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
03/06/1945 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
03/06/1945 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
02/05/1945 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | | |
02/05/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
02/05/1945 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | | |
02/05/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
01/30/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
01/30/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
01/04/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
01/04/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
01/04/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
01/02/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
01/02/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
02/05/1944 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
02/05/1944 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
01/07/1944 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
01/07/1944 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
12/27/1943 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
12/27/1943 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
12/23/1943 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
12/23/1943 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
11/03/1943 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
11/03/1943 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
11/03/1943 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
11/03/1943 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
11/03/1943 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
11/03/1943 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
09/30/1943 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
09/30/1943 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
08/31/1943 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
08/31/1943 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
08/31/1943 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
08/31/1943 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
08/31/1943 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
08/31/1943 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/01/1946 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
06/01/1946 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
06/01/1946 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
06/01/1946 | Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed. | | ||
06/01/1946 | Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed. | | ||
06/01/1946 | Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed. | | ||
01/07/1946 | Order of the Court Issued | | ||
01/07/1946 | Order of the Court Issued | | ||
12/20/1945 | Motion for production of documents filed | | ||
12/20/1945 | Document filed (see remarks) | | ||
12/19/1945 | Motion for production of documents filed | | ||
12/19/1945 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
12/19/1945 | Document filed (see remarks) | | ||
12/19/1945 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
12/12/1945 | Miscellaneous Motion | Filing granted | | |
12/12/1945 | Motion for production of documents filed | | ||
12/12/1945 | Miscellaneous Motion | Filing granted | | |
12/12/1945 | Motion for production of documents filed | | ||
12/10/1945 | Stay Order issued | | ||
12/10/1945 | Motion to Stay Filed | Filing granted | | |
12/10/1945 | Stay Order issued | | ||
12/10/1945 | Motion to Stay Filed | Filing granted | | |
11/20/1945 | Motion for Leave to file Motion for Rehearing | | ||
11/20/1945 | Motion for Leave to file Motion for Rehearing | | ||
11/07/1945 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
11/07/1945 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
11/07/1945 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
11/07/1945 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
04/26/1945 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
04/26/1945 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
04/06/1945 | Supplement to Motion for Rehearing | | ||
04/06/1945 | Supplement to Motion for Rehearing | | ||
03/13/1945 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
03/13/1945 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
03/06/1945 | Reply to Response | | ||
03/06/1945 | Reply to Response | | ||
02/21/1945 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/21/1945 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/05/1945 | Appendix Filed | | ||
02/05/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
02/05/1945 | Appendix Filed | | ||
02/05/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
01/30/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
01/30/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
01/09/1945 | Motion to Argue filed | | ||
01/09/1945 | Motion to Argue filed | | ||
01/08/1945 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
01/08/1945 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
01/04/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/04/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/04/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/02/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/02/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
10/03/1944 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/03/1944 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/21/1944 | Motion to Amend Filed | | ||
02/21/1944 | Motion to Amend Filed | | ||
02/05/1944 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
02/05/1944 | Miscellaneous Motion | Filing granted | | |
02/05/1944 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
01/07/1944 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
01/07/1944 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
01/03/1944 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
01/03/1944 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
12/27/1943 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
12/27/1943 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
12/23/1943 | Reply to Response | | ||
12/23/1943 | Reply to Response | | ||
11/24/1943 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
11/24/1943 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
11/23/1943 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
11/23/1943 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
11/22/1943 | Bond | | ||
11/22/1943 | Bond | | ||
11/17/1943 | Miscellaneous Motion | Dismissed | | |
11/17/1943 | Miscellaneous Motion | Dismissed | | |
11/03/1943 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
11/03/1943 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
11/03/1943 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1943 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
11/03/1943 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
11/03/1943 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
09/30/1943 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
09/30/1943 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
08/31/1943 | Response to Petition | | ||
08/31/1943 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
08/31/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
08/31/1943 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
08/31/1943 | Response to Petition | | ||
08/31/1943 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
08/31/1943 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
08/31/1943 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
K. Hughes, et al. | Petitioner | |
State of Texas | Petitioner | |
Saner, Saner, and Jack | Amicus Curiae | |
Alberto Balli, et al. | Respondent | |
Hector Crandall | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information