Case: 00-0570
00-0570
06/09/2000
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
HARVEY L. GOUGH
BERNICE FLORENCE GOUGH
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/11/2000 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | On behalf of Harvey L. Gough | |
06/09/2000 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix attached to petition | |
06/09/2000 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Harvey L. Gough | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/18/2000 | Case Stored | 19-C-5 | | |
12/11/2000 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order mailed to the Court of Appeals. | | |
09/14/2000 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | Justice Hankinson not sitting. | |
08/11/2000 | Motion for Rehearing | On behalf of Harvey L. Gough | | |
08/11/2000 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | Record remains in clerk's office | | |
07/27/2000 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
06/27/2000 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
06/26/2000 | Response Waiver filed | On behalf of Bernice Gough | | |
06/09/2000 | Appendix Filed | Appendix attached to petition | | |
06/09/2000 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Harvey L. Gough | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
12/18/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Location: 19-C-5 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
GOUGH, BERNICE | Respondent | Mr. Louis P. Bickel Mr. John Eric Gambrell Mr. C. Sidney McClain Honorable John B. Peyton |
GOUGH, HARVEY L. | Petitioner | Mr. Jeffrey W. Hellberg Jr. Mr. Jeffrey Robnett Mr. Christopher M. Weil Mr. Rondal Terry Bell Mr. Anthony A. Petrocchi |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-99-00459-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 47.7, 04-12-00
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable SUE LAGARDE
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 2
Dallas
Honorable Robert E. Price
97-2092-P2