Case: 00-0582
00-0582
06/09/2000
Second Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
C. C. KILGORE, ET AL.
BLACK STONE OIL CO., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/26/2001 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
01/26/2001 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | On behalf of C. C. KilgoreSequence #: 01 | |
01/26/2001 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | on behalf of University of Texas Medical BranchSequence #: 02 | |
12/05/2000 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | Reply to respondents' brief on the merits on behalf of C.C. Kilgore, et al.Sequence #: 01 | |
12/05/2000 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | reply brief on behalf of The University of Texas System Board of RegentsSequence #: 02 | |
11/29/2000 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | James Price's brief on the merits | |
11/27/2000 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | Brief on the merits on behalf of Black Stone Oil Company, et al. | |
10/16/2000 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | petitioners' C.C. Kilgore, et al. brief on the meritsSequence #: 01 | |
10/16/2000 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | BRIEF ON THE MERITS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM BOARD OF REGENTSSequence #: 02 | |
09/08/2000 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | C.C. Kilgore, et al.'s reply brief appendix (12)Sequence #: 01 | |
09/08/2000 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | On behalf of C.C. Kilgore, et al.Sequence #: 01 | |
08/30/2000 | Appendix Filed | Respondent | appendix to response by Black Stone, et al. | |
08/30/2000 | Response to Petition | Respondent | The Black Stone, defendants, The Comstock, Defendants, W. T. Carter & Bro., Union defendents, and Sonat exploration companys' response to petitioners' pet | |
07/13/2000 | Letter brief | Petitioner | Re: call to the Court's attention the impropriety of the two respondents "spe ing" waivers which refer to matters outside the summary judgment in this case.Sequence #: 01 | |
07/12/2000 | Letter brief | Respondent | Union Oil Co. of California states petitioners' are attempting to relitigate t he very issue that was decided in year 1916. | |
07/07/2000 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | reply to response waiver on behalf of KilgoreSequence #: 01 | |
06/15/2000 | Amended Petition for Review filed | Petitioner | Corrected petition for review (has no new material, but substitutes pages on w hich has typographical errors)Sequence #: 01 | |
06/12/2000 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | appendix attachedSequence #: 02 | |
06/12/2000 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Behalf Board of Regents of the University of Texas System for the use and benefit of The University of Texas Medical Branch at GalvestonSequence #: 02 | |
06/09/2000 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix (12)Sequence #: 01 | |
06/09/2000 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of C. C. Kilgore, et alSequence #: 01 | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/26/2001 | Case Stored | G02/20-F-4 | | |
05/29/2001 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | with the record to The Court of Appeals. | | |
05/29/2001 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | to The Court of Appeals with the final order. | | |
04/05/2001 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Two applications for writ of error denied. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
04/05/2001 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
04/05/2001 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | Of C.C. Kilgore | |
04/05/2001 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | Of University of Texas Medical Branch | |
01/26/2001 | Motion for Rehearing | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | | |
01/26/2001 | Motion for Rehearing | on behalf of University of Texas Medical BranchSequence #: 02 | | |
01/26/2001 | Motion for Rehearing | On behalf of C. C. KilgoreSequence #: 01 | | |
01/26/2001 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | record remains in clerk's officeSequence #: 02 | | |
01/26/2001 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | record remains in clerk's officeSequence #: 01 | | |
01/26/2001 | Notice requesting filing fee | Requested $15.00 for filing mo/re Letter sent to Joe G. Roady | | |
01/11/2001 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
01/11/2001 | Petition for Review disposed | Two applications for writ of error denied. | On behalf of C.C. Kilgore, et al. as amended. | |
01/11/2001 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | Of The Board of Regents of the U.T. System | |
12/05/2000 | Reply to Response | Reply to respondents' brief on the merits on behalf of C.C. Kilgore, et al.Sequence #: 01 | | |
12/05/2000 | Reply to Response | reply brief on behalf of The University of Texas System Board of RegentsSequence #: 02 | | |
11/29/2000 | Brief on the Merits | James Price's brief on the merits | | |
11/27/2000 | Brief on the Merits | Brief on the merits on behalf of Black Stone Oil Company, et al. | | |
10/31/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | respondents' m/e/t to file brief on the merits is granted; respondents' brief is due 11-20-00; petitioners' reply brief is due 12-5-00 | |
10/25/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Respondents' m/e/t to file respondents' brief on the merits | | |
10/18/2000 | Sealed document filed in case | 3 boxes of sealed exhibits | | |
10/16/2000 | Brief on the Merits | BRIEF ON THE MERITS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM BOARD OF REGENTSSequence #: 02 | | |
10/16/2000 | Brief on the Merits | petitioners' C.C. Kilgore, et al. brief on the meritsSequence #: 01 | | |
10/06/2000 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Filing granted | Petitioner #1 unopposed motion to tranfer in camera documents was granted | |
10/02/2000 | Record Received (See Remarks) | Inventory in remarks section. | | |
09/26/2000 | Miscellaneous Motion | Petitioners' unopposed motion to transfer on camera documents | | |
09/14/2000 | Brief on the Merits Requested | petitioner/s brief on the merits is due 10-16-00; respondent/s brief on the merits is due 11-6-00; petitioner/s reply brief is due 11-21-00 | | |
09/14/2000 | Record Requested in Petition for Review | Called 9th COA; spoke to Rhonda. | | |
09/08/2000 | Appendix Filed | C.C. Kilgore, et al.'s reply brief appendix (12)Sequence #: 01 | | |
09/08/2000 | Reply to Response | On behalf of C.C. Kilgore, et al.Sequence #: 01 | | |
08/30/2000 | Appendix Filed | appendix to response by Black Stone, et al. | | |
08/30/2000 | Response to Petition | The Black Stone, defendants, The Comstock, Defendants, W. T. Carter & Bro., Union defendents, and Sonat exploration companys' response to petitioners' pet | | |
08/10/2000 | Notice from Counsel of a change in address | for Kenneth R. Breitbeil | | |
07/31/2000 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Response due Wednesday, 8/30/00 | | |
07/18/2000 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
07/13/2000 | Letter brief | Re: call to the Court's attention the impropriety of the two respondents "spe ing" waivers which refer to matters outside the summary judgment in this case.Sequence #: 01 | | |
07/12/2000 | Letter brief | Union Oil Co. of California states petitioners' are attempting to relitigate t he very issue that was decided in year 1916. | | |
07/07/2000 | Reply to Response | reply to response waiver on behalf of KilgoreSequence #: 01 | | |
07/07/2000 | Response Waiver filed | on behalf of Sonat Exploration Company | | |
07/03/2000 | Response Waiver filed | Comstock Oil and Gas, Inc. waives response. By Mr. J. Robt Beatty | | |
06/21/2000 | Response Waiver filed | Oryx Development Limited Partnership, Sun Operating Limited Partnership, Oryx Energy Company waives its response to the petition for review | | |
06/15/2000 | Amended Petition for Review filed | Corrected petition for review (has no new material, but substitutes pages on w hich has typographical errors)Sequence #: 01 | | |
06/12/2000 | Appendix Filed | appendix attachedSequence #: 02 | | |
06/12/2000 | Petition for Review | Behalf Board of Regents of the University of Texas System for the use and benefit of The University of Texas Medical Branch at GalvestonSequence #: 02 | | |
06/09/2000 | Appendix Filed | Appendix (12)Sequence #: 01 | | |
06/09/2000 | Petition for Review | On behalf of C. C. Kilgore, et alSequence #: 01 | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
06/26/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Location 20-F-4 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
AUTRY, CARL | Petitioner | Mr. Roger S. McCabe |
THE BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UN | Intervenor | Justice John Cornyn |
SONAT EXPLORATION COMPANY | Respondent | Mr. E. Glenn Thames Jr. Mr. Michael E. Jones |
COMSTOCK OIL & GAS, INC. | Respondent | Mr. J. Robert Beatty |
KILGORE, CHARLES C. | Petitioner | Mr. Joe G. Roady |
THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM | Intervenor | Ms. Jeffee L. Palmer |
OGLETREE OIL PRODUCTION COMPAN | Respondent | Mr. Jess H. Hall Jr. |
THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS MEDICA | Intervenor | Ms. Laquita A. Hamilton Mr. William A. 'Andy' Taylor Ms. Karen Watson Kornell Ms. Linda S. Eads |
ARDERSON, MARGARET | Petitioner | Mr. Donald M. Hunt |
ORYX DEVELOPMENT LIMITED PARTN | Respondent | Mr. Allen D. Cummings |
KILGORE, C. C. | Petitioner | Mr. Joe G. Roady |
UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNI | Respondent | Ms. Lauren Beck Harris Mr. Kenneth R. Breitbeil |
AUTRY, EARL | Petitioner | Mr. Terrell Lane Pace |
KCS RESOURCES, INC. | Respondent | Mr. Charles R. Roberts |
ALLEN, ANN BULLARD | Petitioner | Ms. Mary-Ann A. Bellatti |
W.T. CARTER & BRO | Respondent | Mr. Spikes Kangerga Mr. Gilbert I. "Buddy" Low Mr. James D. Thompson III |
AUTRY, DANIEL | Petitioner | Mr. Bill R. Jones |
BLACK STONE OIL COMPANY | Respondent | Mr. Joe Scott Evans Mr. Stacy Lee Williams |
Court of Appeals Information:
09-98-00143-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
___ SW3d ___ 04-27-00
9th Court of Appeals
Honorable DAVID FARRIS
Trial Court Information
258th District Court
Polk
Honorable Joe Ned Dean
16,791