Case: 00-0577
00-0577
06/09/2000
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
MARY BROWN and KIT BROWN
NELSON WONG, D.D.S.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/10/2000 | Response to Petition | Respondent | on behalf of Nelson Wong, D.D.S. | |
06/09/2000 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix attached to petition | |
06/09/2000 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Mary & kit Brown | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/04/2000 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order mailed to the COA. | | |
09/27/2000 | Case Stored | 40-A-3 | | |
08/10/2000 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
08/10/2000 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
07/11/2000 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
07/10/2000 | Response to Petition | on behalf of Nelson Wong, D.D.S. | | |
06/20/2000 | Certification (various) in case received | Certificate of conference for 53.7 filed 06-14-00 | | |
06/20/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Petitioners' m/e/t to file petition was granted until 06/19/00; petition was f iled 06/09/00. | |
06/14/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | 53.7(f) on behalf of Mary Brown and Kit Brown | | |
06/14/2000 | Notice requesting filing fee | Requesting $10.00 filing fee for 53.7(f) Sent to Mr. Philips PAID | | |
06/14/2000 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Spoke w/ Mr. Smith; will be sending certificate of conference & filing fee for pet's m/e/t SENT CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE 06-20-00 | | |
06/12/2000 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Will be sending m/e/t to file petition for review Font is wrong size and no signature | | |
06/09/2000 | Appendix Filed | Appendix attached to petition | | |
06/09/2000 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Mary & kit Brown | | |
06/09/2000 | Petition for writ received | On behalf of Mary Brown and Kit Brown | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
09/27/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 40-A-3 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BROWN, KIT | Petitioner | Mr. Charles Clyde Philips |
WONG, D.D.S., NELSON | Respondent | Ms. Susan Irene Jordan Mr. Gregory J. Lensing |
BROWN, MARY | Petitioner | Mr. Charles Clyde Philips |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-99-00706-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 47.7, 04-24-00
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable SUE LAGARDE
Trial Court Information
219th District Court
Collin
Honorable Curt B. Henderson
219-0142-98