Case Information: 85-CV-0486 | |||
Short Caption: | GREEN, CLIFFORD VESHARN N. SCALES | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA15644-82 | Filed Date: | 04/16/1985 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/16/1985 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 03/03/1986 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 06/02/1986 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 09/18/1986 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | GREEN, CLIFFORD VESHARN N. SCALES ET AL | |||
04/16/1985 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
03/03/1986 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
06/02/1986 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
09/18/1986 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
10/23/1986 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |