Case: 05-81-01295-CR
05-81-01295-CR
12/14/1981
Aggravated Robbery
Carl Wendell Brown
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/26/2017 | Retention time case file will be retained | Retain | |
10/26/1983 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/25/1983 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
08/22/1983 | Letter issued by the court | | |
12/10/1982 | Submitted | | |
03/19/1982 | Brief Filed | | |
02/17/1982 | Brief Filed | | |
02/01/1982 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/06/1982 | Clerks record filed | | |
12/14/1981 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/26/1983 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 194th District Court
f81-11376-HM
Life, TDC