judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-81-01294-CR
05-81-01294-CR
12/14/1981
Murder
Carl Wendell Brown
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
06/26/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
02/09/1990Case forwarded to higher court
10/26/1983Mandate Issued
08/25/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/22/1983Letter issued by the court
08/19/1983Letter received
12/10/1982Submitted
03/19/1982Brief Filed
02/22/1982Motion filed
02/17/1982Brief Filed
02/01/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/06/1982Exhibits filed
01/06/1982Reporters record filed
01/06/1982Clerks record filed
12/14/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/26/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 194th District Court
F81-11374-HM
Life, tdc & $10000 Fine